United States of America v. Shull

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Terry L. Shull
Case Number: 1:2018cv00089
Filed: December 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7402
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 MOTION to Continue filed by United States of America. The hearing is CONTINUED to Monday, April 8, 2019, at 10:30 a.m. at the U.S. Courthouse in Nashville, Tennessee. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 2/7/19. (gb)
February 6, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Continue - EX PARTE by United States of America. (Jordan, Stephen)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Hearing set for 3/4/2019 10:30 AM in Courtroom A826 before District Judge William L. Campbell Jr. At such hearing, the Court will consider whether it should order enforcement of the administrative summons of the Internal Revenue Service. If the Respondent opposes judicial enforcement of such summons, he may appear at such hearing and present to the Court any cause why the summons should not be so enforced. A copy of this order be served on the Respondent at least 30 days prior to the date assigned for the hearing. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 1/2/19. (gb)
December 20, 2018 Note to Filer: The IRS Summons and Declaration were submitted as 17x22 inch page size. These documents shall be REFILED using the standard 8.5x11 inch page size. (gb)
December 20, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (gb)
December 20, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for Stephen P. Jordan. (gb)
December 19, 2018 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Paula Basham filed by United States of America. (gb) (Main Document 2 replaced on 12/20/2018) (gb).
December 19, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION to Enforce IRS Summons, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - IRS Summons, #2 Attachment Proposed Order, #3 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(gb) (Attachment 1 replaced on 12/20/2018) (gb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Shull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry L. Shull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Stephen P. Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?