Boyd v. Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Barbra Boyd
Defendant: Akita Kyle, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company and Allison White Baker Agency
Case Number: 1:2019cv00011
Filed: January 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Referring Judge: Barbara D Holmes
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:4053
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2019 Filing 11 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by Barbra Boyd. (Bobbitt, Jonathan)
February 14, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS returned executed by Barbra Boyd. Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company served on 2/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Service, #2 Exhibit 2 - Certified Mail Return Reciept)(Bobbitt, Jonathan)
February 11, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Russell E. Reviere. (jm)
February 8, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Russell E. Reviere on behalf of Allison White Baker Agency, Akita Kyle, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company (Reviere, Russell)
February 6, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS returned executed by Barbra Boyd. Akita Kyle served on 2/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Service, #2 Exhibit 2 - Certified Mail Return Reciept)(Bobbitt, Jonathan)
February 6, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS returned executed by Barbra Boyd. Allison White Baker Agency served on 2/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Service, #2 Exhibit 2 - Certified Mail Return Reciept)(Bobbitt, Jonathan)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 1/24/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jm)
January 23, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/11/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 764 before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (jm)
January 10, 2019 Filing 4 Summons issued as to Allison White Baker Agency, Akita Kyle, and Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. (Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail.) (jm)
January 10, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Jonathan L. Bobbitt and J. Brandon McWherter. (jm)
January 10, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (jm)
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (jm)
January 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Allison White Baker Agency, Akita Kyle, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2828914), filed by Barbra Boyd. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Policy)(jm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boyd v. Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Akita Kyle
Represented By: Russell E. Reviere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Russell E. Reviere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allison White Baker Agency
Represented By: Russell E. Reviere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbra Boyd
Represented By: J. Brandon McWherter
Represented By: Jonathan L. Bobbitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?