Gossett v. United Healthcare Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Michelle Gossett
Defendant: United Healthcare Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00033
Filed: March 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Referring Judge: Barbara D Holmes
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 3/22/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
March 19, 2019 Filing 5 Summons issued as to United Healthcare Insurance Company. (Service packets sent to attorney K. Cody Allison by regular mail.) (am)
March 19, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for K. Cody Allison, Samuel D. Payne, Lauren W. Travis. (am)
March 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/14/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 764 before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (am)
March 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (am)
March 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (am)
March 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United Healthcare Insurance Company (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2872895), filed by Michelle Gossett. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(am)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gossett v. United Healthcare Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Healthcare Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Gossett
Represented By: Samuel D. Payne
Represented By: Lauren W. Travis
Represented By: K. Cody Allison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?