Oakley v. Cathey et al
Plaintiff: Jaston Antione Oakley
Defendant: Maury County Highway Dept. and Andy Cathey
Case Number: 1:2019cv00047
Filed: June 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Joe Brown
Referring Judge: William L Campbell
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 6 Summons along with 285 form issued as to Andy Cathey. Forwarded to U.S. Marshal to effect service. (mg)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Plaintiff lacks sufficient financial resources from which to pay the full filing fee in advance. Therefore, his application (Doc. No. #2 ) is hereby GRANTED. Jaston Antione Oakley is hereby assessed the full $350 filing fee. The Court has reviewed the complaint pursuant to the PLRA and, for the reasons set forth in the Memorandum entered contemporaneously with this Order, finds that the complaint states a colorable Fourteenth Amendment Equal Protection claim under Section 1983 against Defendant Andy Cathey in his individual capacity. That claim shall proceed for further development. However, the remaining claims fail to state claims upon which relief can be granted. Accordingly, those claims and Defendant Maury County Highway Department are DISMISSED. Consequently, the Clerk is instructed to send Plaintiff a service packet (a blank summons and USM 285 form) for the remaining Defendant. Plaintiff will complete the service packet and return it to the Clerk's Office within twenty-one (21) days of the date of receipt of this Order. Upon return of the service packet, PROCESS SHALL ISSUE to Defendant Cathey. This action is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge to enter a scheduling order for the management of the case. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 6/18/19. (xc: Pro se party by regular mail w/ 1 service packet. Administrator of inmate trust fund accounts at Maury County Jail by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
June 18, 2019 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 6/18/19. (xc: Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
June 5, 2019 Notice mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service form included). (afs)
June 5, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (afs)
June 4, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Jaston Antione Oakley. (afs)
June 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andy Cathey, Maury County Highway Dept., filed by Jaston Antione Oakley.(afs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oakley v. Cathey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maury County Highway Dept.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andy Cathey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaston Antione Oakley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?