DMS, LLC v. Central Mutual Insurance Company
Plaintiff: DMS, LLC
Defendant: Central Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00051
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Referring Judge: Barbara D Holmes
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Filing 9 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by DMS, LLC. (McWherter, J.)
June 19, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Central Mutual Insurance Company.(Wright, Heather)
June 17, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan L. Bobbitt on behalf of DMS, LLC (Bobbitt, Jonathan)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 6/14/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jm)
June 14, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Clinton H. Scott, Jonathan L. Bobbitt, and Stephen Todd Bobo. (jm)
June 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/22/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 764 before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (jm)
June 13, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Clinton H. Scott on behalf of DMS, LLC (Scott, Clinton)
June 12, 2019 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Austin Holland: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall be admitted to practice. The application for admission is available on the website at #http://www.tnmd.uscourts.gov/forms/admission-practice-application (LR 83.01(a)). Admission due by 7/3/2019. (jm)
June 12, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Heather Howell Wright, Austin Holland, and J. Brandon McWherter. (jm)
June 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (jm)
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (jm)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Central Mutual Insurance Company from Circuit Court for Marshall County, Tennessee, case number 2019-CV-23. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0650-2931939) (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Pleadings)(jm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DMS, LLC v. Central Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DMS, LLC
Represented By: J. Brandon McWherter
Represented By: Stephen Todd Bobo
Represented By: Clinton H. Scott
Represented By: Jonathan L. Bobbitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Heather Howell Wright
Represented By: Austin Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?