Jefferson v. Harris
Plaintiff: Kenneth Jefferson
Defendant: Frances L. Harris
Case Number: 1:2019cv00066
Filed: July 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Referring Judge: Barbara D Holmes
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes: Initial Case Management Conference held in Columbia Courthouse on 9/20/2019; ORDER to enter. (Tape #digital recording.) (Hearing lasted :48)(jwc)
September 13, 2019 Filing 11 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by Kenneth Jefferson. (Herring, Andrew)
September 5, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Frances L. Harris.(Callaway, Gregory)
August 22, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS returned executed by Kenneth Jefferson. Frances L. Harris served on 8/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certified Return Receipt)(Herring, Andrew)
August 21, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Gregory W. Callaway. (mg)
August 15, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory W. Callaway on behalf of Frances L. Harris (Callaway, Gregory)
August 6, 2019 Filing 7 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Kenneth Jefferson. (Herring, Andrew)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the District Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 8/2/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
August 1, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/20/2019 at 11:00 AM in Columbia before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (mg)
August 1, 2019 Filing 4 Summons issued as to Frances L. Harris. Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail. (mg)
August 1, 2019 AL State Bar status verified as active for Andrew S. Herring. (Note: Andrew S. Herring has been admitted to practice in this district.) (mg)
August 1, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg)
August 1, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (mg)
July 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Frances L. Harris (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2962751), filed by Kenneth Jefferson. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jefferson v. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Jefferson
Represented By: Andrew S. Herring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frances L. Harris
Represented By: Gregory W. Callaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?