Somerville v. Parker et al
Plaintiff: Terrence Somerville
Defendant: Tennessee Parole Board, Tony Parker, Kevin Genovese, Corporal f/n/u Hickerson, Stacey Oakes, Kevin Meyers and Jason Clendenin
Case Number: 1:2019cv00068
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Referring Judge: Barbara D Holmes
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Plaintiff has thus failed to comply with the Court's Order in at least three different ways. This matter is accordingly DISMISSED without prejudice for failure to comply with the Court's Orders and to take action necessary to prosecute this case. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 9/30/2019. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jw)
September 16, 2019 Filing 7 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Terrence Somerville. (jw)
September 16, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Jason Clendenin, Kevin Genovese, Kevin Meyers, Stacey Oakes, Tony Parker, Tennessee Parole Board, filed by Terrence Somerville.(jw)
August 23, 2019 Filing 5 Letter to the Court from Terrence Somerville. (jw)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: The #2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is DENIED without prejudice to Plaintiff's ability to submit a second, properly supported application. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to mail Plaintiff a new blank application to proceed in forma pauperis and a copy of Administrative Order 93. The Clerk is DIRECTED to mail Plaintiff a blank Section 1983 complaint form for Plaintiff's use in complying with this Order. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 8/20/2019. (xc:Order, blank IFP, and blank Complaint form to pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jw)
August 14, 2019 NOTICE mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service form included). (jw)
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (jw)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Terrence Somerville. (jw)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jason Clendenin, Kevin Genovese, f/n/u Hickerson, Kevin Meyers, Stacey Oakes, Tony Parker, Tennessee Parole Board, filed by Terrence Somerville.(jw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Somerville v. Parker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tennessee Parole Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Genovese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corporal f/n/u Hickerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stacey Oakes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Meyers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Clendenin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrence Somerville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?