Delk v. Bumpas, et al.
Plaintiff: Adrian Deshun Delk
Defendant: Laura Petty, Jasper Brewster and Thelma Bumpas
Case Number: 1:2019cv00081
Filed: October 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Office: Columbia Office
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Filing 36 Case transferred in from the District of Tennessee Western; Case Number 1:16-cv-01275. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER SEVERING AND TRANSFERRING CLAIMS, PARTIALLY DISMISSING COMPLAINT, AND DIRECTING THAT PROCESS BE ISSUED AND SERVED ON THE REMAINING DEFENDANTS. Signed by Judge James D. Todd on 10/11/19. (cdi) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 10/11/2019.]
November 2, 2018 Filing 31 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Adrian Deshun Delk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Aff. & Dying Declaration, #3 Circuit Court Order, #4 Sworn Affidavit, #5 Aff. of Facts and Truth, #6 Circuit Crt. Motion Requesting Criminal Prosecution, #7 JMCGH recs - 11-4-17, #8 Macular thickness image, #9 Hughes Eye Center - 1-23-17, #10 Hughes Eye Center - 10-26-17, #11 Hughes Eye Center - 4-14-16, #12 CGA Corporate and Facility Policy, #13 TDOC TOMIS Disc. Report - 11-3-16, #14 TDOC TOMIS Disc. Report - 4-19-17, #15 TDOC TOMIS Disc. Report - 11-3-16.2, #16 TDOC TOMIS Disc. Report - 2-17-17, #17 TDOC TOMIS Disc. Report - 11-4-17, #18 TDOC Disc. Report Appeal, #19 TDOC Offender Classification Summ., #20 Inmate Rules and Regulations - Aug. 2018, #21 Test Report, #22 Inmate Grievance Response, #23 Crim. COA Order, #24 Cert. of Service, #25 Inmate Rules and Regulations - June 2016, #26 envelope)(mbm) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 10/11/2019.]
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER ON PENDING MOTIONS. Signed by Judge James D. Todd on 9/25/17. (mbm) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 10/11/2019.]
October 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING #3 LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND ASSESSING $350 FILING FEE IN ACCORDANCE WITH PLRA. Signed by Judge James D. Todd on 10/24/16. (Todd, James) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 10/11/2019.]
October 21, 2016 Filing 3 Application To Proceed In District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs by Adrian Deshun Delk. (Attachments: #1 Trust Fund, #2 Envelope)(mbb) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 10/11/2019.]
October 21, 2016 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Adrian Deshun Delk. (Exhibit A docketed as a separate sealed entry as it contains medical information.) (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 G, #8 Envelope)(mbb) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 10/11/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Delk v. Bumpas, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Petty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jasper Brewster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thelma Bumpas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrian Deshun Delk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?