Lawson v. Dean et al
Plaintiff: Aaron Dean Lawson
Defendant: Judge Andrew Mark Freiberg, Monica Datz, James David Cross, Roy Dean, Carroll Ross, J Franklin Ammons, Christopher Lochmuller, Warden Perry, Strawn, Randy G Rogers, Steademan, Vanderbilt Hospital even shift helicopter pilot and paramedic, Gregory P Isaacs, Rebecca Jenell Lawson, The Isaacs Law Firm, Kevin White, Neuropsychology Consultants, PLLC, James S. Walker and Wade V Davies
Case Number: 1:2019cv00085
Filed: October 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Office: Columbia Office
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 NOTICE mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service form included). (dt)
November 1, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt)
November 1, 2019 Filing 7 Case transferred in from the District of Tennessee Eastern; Case Number 3:19-cv-00425. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 30, 2019 Case transferred to District of Middle District of Tennessee. (CAT) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 11/1/2019.]
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 JUDGMENT ORDER re #5 Memorandum Opinion. For the reasons set forth in the memorandum opinion filed herewith, the Clerk is DIRECTED to transfer this entire action to the Columbia Division of the Middle District of Tennessee and to CLOSE this Court's file. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 10/30/2019. (Copy of Judgment Order mailed to Aaron Dean Lawson) (CAT) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 11/1/2019.]
October 30, 2019 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM OPINION: Therefore, the Court finds that in the interests of justice, this case should be transferred to the Columbia Division of the Middle District of Tennessee. Accordingly, the Clerk will be DIRECTED to transfer this action to the Columbia Division of the Middle District of Tennessee and CLOSE this Courts file. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 10/30/2019. (Copy of Memorandum Opinion mailed to Aaron Dean Lawson) (CAT) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 11/1/2019.]
October 29, 2019 Filing 4 Notice Regarding Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address. (copy mailed to Aaron Dean Lawson at South Central Correctional Center) (JBR) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 11/1/2019.]
October 28, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of filing Petition for Writ of Certiorari by Aaron Dean Lawson (JBR) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 11/1/2019.]
October 28, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Aaron Dean Lawson. (JBR) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 11/1/2019.]
October 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Aaron Dean Lawson. (Attachments: #1 Other Cover Letter & Envelope)(JBR) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 11/1/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lawson v. Dean et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Andrew Mark Freiberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monica Datz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James David Cross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roy Dean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carroll Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Franklin Ammons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Lochmuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Strawn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy G Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steademan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vanderbilt Hospital even shift helicopter pilot and paramedic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory P Isaacs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca Jenell Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Isaacs Law Firm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neuropsychology Consultants, PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James S. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wade V Davies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Dean Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?