Tine Bak LLC v. Prater 5 Media LLC
Plaintiff: Tine Bak LLC
Defendant: Prater 5 Media LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00094
Filed: December 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Referring Judge: Barbara D Holmes
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:0101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2020 Reset Hearings: Case Management Conference set for 3/13/2020 at 02:00 PM in Columbia before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (hb)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Prater 5 Media LLC answer due 2/7/2020. The initial case management conference is RESCHEDULED from February 7, 2020, to 2:00 p.m, Friday, March 13, 2020, in the 2nd Floor Courtroom, U.S. Courthouse, 815 South Garden Street, Columbia, Tennessee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 1/24/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(hb)
January 23, 2020 Filing 13 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Tine Bak LLC. (Barger, Keane)
January 22, 2020 Filing 12 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Prater 5 Media LLC. (Blanton, Samuel)
January 22, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and to Reschedule Initial Case Management Conference by Prater 5 Media LLC. (Blanton, Samuel)
January 7, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS returned executed by Tine Bak LLC. Prater 5 Media LLC served on 1/3/2020. (Warnock, Timothy)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Nancy J. Mertzel to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 1/3/20. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
January 2, 2020 Filing 8 DECLARATION of Nancy J. Mertzel filed by Tine Bak LLC re: #7 MOTION for attorney Nancy J. Mertzel to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3058337). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Warnock, Timothy)
January 2, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for attorney Nancy J. Mertzel to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3058337) by Tine Bak LLC. (Warnock, Timothy)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the District Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 12/9/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
December 6, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/7/2020 at 11:00 AM in Columbia before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (dt) Modified on 12/6/2019 (dt). (Main Document 5 replaced on 12/6/2019) (dt).
December 6, 2019 Filing 4 Summons issued as to Prater 5 Media LLC. (Service copies will be picked up by counsel.) (dt)
December 6, 2019 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Nancy J. Mertzel: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $100.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 12/27/2019. (dt)
December 6, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Timothy L. Warnock. NY State Bar status verified as active for Nancy J. Mertzel. (dt)
December 6, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (dt)
December 6, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt)
December 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Prater 5 Media LLC (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-3044657), filed by Tine Bak LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(dt) Modified on 12/6/2019 (dt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tine Bak LLC v. Prater 5 Media LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tine Bak LLC
Represented By: Nancy J. Mertzel
Represented By: Timothy L. Warnock
Represented By: Keane A. Barger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prater 5 Media LLC
Represented By: Samuel J. Blanton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?