Totty v. FPMCM,LLC
Plaintiff: Angela R. Totty
Defendant: FPMCM,LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00002
Filed: January 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Referring Judge: Barbara D Holmes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2020 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Case Management Conference reset for 4/7/2020 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 764 before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (am)
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Unopposed Motion to Continue Initial Case Management Conference. Motion, DE12 is GRANTED. ICMC reset for 4/7/20 at 3:30. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 3/11/2020. (am)
March 11, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Brent E. Siler. (am)
March 10, 2020 Filing 12 Unopposed Motion to Continue Initial Case Management Conference by FPMCM,LLC. (Siler, Brent) Modified Text on 3/11/2020 (am).
March 10, 2020 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support of #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by FPMCM,LLC . (Siler, Brent)
March 10, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by FPMCM,LLC. (Siler, Brent)
March 10, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Brent E. Siler on behalf of FPMCM,LLC (Siler, Brent)
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: This civil action is scheduled for an initial case management conference on Friday, March 13, 2020, at 11:30 a.m. in Columbia. It is hereby ORDERED that the case management conference is moved to Nashville, Courtroom No.764, U.S. Courthouse, 801 Broadway, and it remains scheduled on March 13, 2020 at 11:30 a.m. The Court notes that no appearance has been filed on behalf of Defendant. Therefore, counsel for Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Order on Defendant or otherwise ensure that Defendant (or its registered agent for service) is aware of the changed location. Additionally, the Court notes that, according to the return of service filed on February 25, 2020, it appears that Defendant was served on February 18, 2020. However, Plaintiff has not yet moved for default. If a motion for entry of default is filed prior to March 13, 2020, the initial case management conference will be automatically canceled without further order, and Plaintiff's counsel will not be required to appear. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 3/5/2020. (am)
February 25, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS returned executed by Angela R. Totty. FPMCM,LLC served on 2/18/2020. (Hallworth, Eugene)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 1/17/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
January 16, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/13/2020 at 11:30 AM in Columbia before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (am)
January 16, 2020 Filing 4 Summons issued as to FPMCM,LLC. (Service packets sent to attorney by regular mail.) (am)
January 16, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Eugene Raymond Hallworth. (am)
January 16, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (am)
January 16, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (am)
January 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FPMCM,LLC (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-3066755), filed by Angela R. Totty. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit - EEOC Right to Sue)(am)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Totty v. FPMCM,LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FPMCM,LLC
Represented By: Brent E. Siler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela R. Totty
Represented By: Eugene Raymond Hallworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?