Valdes v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Santiago Froilan Valdes
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Interested Party: SSA-Email Notification
Case Number: 1:2020cv00009
Filed: February 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Barbara D Holmes
Referring Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for a scheduling order, for decision on all nondispositive matters, and for a Report and Recommendation on disposition of Plaintiff's Complaint for judicial review of the decision of the Social Security Administration. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 3/4/2020. Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes added.(gb)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #3 Motion for David F. Chermol to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 3/3/20. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
March 2, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (gb)
March 2, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Robert C. Wilson. (gb)
February 28, 2020 Filing 6 RECEIPT #34675058082 in the amount of $100 posted by Santiago Froilan Valdes re #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (gb)
February 28, 2020 Filing 5 RECEIPT #34675058081 in the amount of $400 posted by Santiago Froilan Valdes re #1 Social Security Complaint. (gb)
February 25, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert C. Wilson on behalf of Santiago Froilan Valdes (Wilson, Robert)
February 16, 2020 Filing 3 First MOTION for attorney David F. Chermol to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee paid #6 ) by Santiago Froilan Valdes. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order, #2 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Chermol, David) Modified text on 3/2/2020 (gb).
February 7, 2020 NOTICE TO COUNSEL David F. Chermol: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall associate local counsel qualified to practice in the United States District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee. Local counsel shall electronically file a Notice of Appearance (LR 83.01(d)). Appearance by local counsel due by 2/28/2020. (gb)
February 7, 2020 NOTICE TO COUNSEL David F. Chermol: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $100.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 2/28/2020. (gb)
February 7, 2020 PA State Bar status verified as active for David F. Chermol. (gb)
February 7, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (gb)
February 7, 2020 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration (Filing fee $400 paid #5 ), filed by Santiago Froilan Valdes. Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(gb) Modified text on 3/2/2020 (gb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valdes v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA-Email Notification
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Santiago Froilan Valdes
Represented By: David F. Chermol
Represented By: Robert C. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?