Atwood v. JCF Residences Management Company, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Brittani Atwood
Defendant: JCF Residences Management Company, LLC, John Fitzmaurice and JCF Residences Development Company, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00056
Filed: September 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Referring Judge: Barbara D Holmes
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2020 Filing 16 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by JCF Residences Management Company, LLC. (Conrad, Frederick)
October 27, 2020 Filing 15 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by JCF Residences Development Company, LLC. (Conrad, Frederick)
October 26, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by John Fitzmaurice, JCF Residences Development Company, LLC, JCF Residences Management Company, LLC.(Conrad, Frederick)
October 22, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Frederick L. Conrad, III, John E. B. Gerth admitted to this court. (mg)
October 21, 2020 Reset Hearing: Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone is reset for 12/7/2020 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (mg)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Before the Court is the joint motion of the parties to continue the October 26, 2020, initial case management conference filed October 21, 2020 (Docket Entry No. #12 ), which is GRANTED. The initial case management conference is RESCHEDULED from October 26, 2020, to 2:30 p.m, Monday, December 7, 2020, by telephone conference. See Docket Entry No. #6 for dial-in instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 10/21/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
October 21, 2020 Filing 12 Joint MOTION to Continue INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by John Fitzmaurice, JCF Residences Development Company, LLC, JCF Residences Management Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Gerth, John)
October 21, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by John E. B. Gerth on behalf of All Defendants (Gerth, John)
October 21, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Frederick L. Conrad, III on behalf of All Defendants (Conrad, Frederick)
October 5, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS returned executed by Brittani Atwood. JCF Residences Management Company, LLC served on 10/5/2020. (Garrison, David)
October 5, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS returned executed by Brittani Atwood. John Fitzmaurice served on 10/5/2020. (Garrison, David)
October 5, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS returned executed by Brittani Atwood. JCF Residences Development Company, LLC served on 10/5/2020. (Garrison, David)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: The initial case management conference in this case, scheduled for 3:30 p.m. on October 26, 2020, will be held telephonically. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 10/1/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
September 21, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/26/2020 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 764 before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (mg)
September 21, 2020 Filing 4 Summons issued as to John Fitzmaurice, JCF Residences Development Company, LLC, JCF Residences Management Company, LLC. Service copies will be returned to counsel (David Garrison) by mail. (mg)
September 21, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg)
September 21, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (mg)
September 21, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for David W. Garrison, and Joshua A. Frank. (mg)
September 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Fitzmaurice, JCF Residences Development Company, LLC, JCF Residences Management Company, LLC (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-3218588), filed by Brittani Atwood. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Atwood v. JCF Residences Management Company, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JCF Residences Management Company, LLC
Represented By: Frederick L. Conrad, III
Represented By: John E. B. Gerth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Fitzmaurice
Represented By: Frederick L. Conrad, III
Represented By: John E. B. Gerth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JCF Residences Development Company, LLC
Represented By: Frederick L. Conrad, III
Represented By: John E. B. Gerth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittani Atwood
Represented By: David W. Garrison
Represented By: Joshua A. Frank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?