Bates v. Vulcan Materials Company
Plaintiff: Deborah Bates
Defendant: Vulcan Materials Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv00061
Filed: September 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Referring Judge: Barbara D Holmes
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: An initial case management conference is SCHEDULED for December 11, 2020, at 1:30 p.m. to be held telephonically using the Court's conference line. See Docket No. #7 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 11/13/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(vh)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 AGREED ORDER TO SET ASIDE STIPULATED ORDER OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL: Stipulated Order of Voluntary Dismissal is Set Aside. This matter is back to active status. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 11/12/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(vh)
November 10, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Set Aside by Deborah Bates. (Zuccarello, Donald)
November 6, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Set Aside Stipulated Order of Voluntary Dismissal by Deborah Bates. (Zuccarello, Donald)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 10/27/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)
October 27, 2020 Filing 9 PROPOSED ORDER OF DISMISSAL Stipulated Order of Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice filed by Vulcan Materials Company. (Risin, Clarence)
October 21, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Vulcan Materials Company.(Risin, Clarence)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: The initial case management conference is RESCHEDULED to be by telephone at 2:30 p.m. on 10/30/2020. Counsel should use the following dial-in information to participate in the telephonic initial case management conference: Dial-in number: 877-402-9753, Access Code: 3808663#. Counsel are reminded of the requirement to file a joint proposed initial case management order at least three (3) business days prior to the initial case management conference. If the parties are unable to file a joint proposed initial case management conference by this date, they must file a motion to continue the initial case management conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 10/5/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc) Modified on 10/6/2020 (kc).
September 29, 2020 Filing 6 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Vulcan Materials Company. (Risin, Clarence)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the District Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 9/28/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)
September 28, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/30/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 764 before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (vh)
September 28, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Donald D. Zuccarello and Clarence Risin admitted to this court. (vh)
September 28, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (vh)
September 28, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (vh)
September 25, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Vulcan Materials Company from Circuit Court for Maury County, Tennessee, case number 16831. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0650-3223131) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Copies of State Court Pleadings (Maury County Circuit Court), #2 Exhibit B - Copy of Notice of Filing Notice of Removal (to State Court Clerk), #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(vh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bates v. Vulcan Materials Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Bates
Represented By: Donald D. Zuccarello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vulcan Materials Company
Represented By: Clarence Risin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?