Klein v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Steven Joseph Klein
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Interested Party: SSA-Email Notification
Case Number: 1:2020cv00066
Filed: October 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Referring Judge: Barbara D Holmes
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Bert W. Coleman is granted. Signed by Vicki Kinkade, Chief Deputy Clerk, on 12/01/2020. (vk)
November 16, 2020 KS State Bar status verified as active for Bert Coleman not admitted to this court - Local counsel not required. (ln)
November 13, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Bert Coleman on behalf of Social Security Administration (Coleman, Bert)
November 13, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for attorney Bert W. Coleman to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee waived) by Social Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing, District of Kansas)(Coleman, Bert) Modified on 11/16/2020 (ln).
October 28, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Robert Scott Wilson admitted to this court. (ln)
October 27, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Scott Wilson on behalf of Steven Joseph Klein (Wilson, Robert)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Karl E. Osterhout is granted. Signed by Vicki Kinkade, Chief Deputy Clerk, on 10/14/2020. vk
October 12, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for attorney Karl E. Osterhout to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3233092) by Steven Joseph Klein. (Attachments: #1 Attachment CGS - WD PA, #2 Attachment CGS - Supreme Court, #3 Attachment Proposed Order)(Osterhout, Karl)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 10/9/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(hb)
October 9, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail. (mg)
October 9, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg)
October 9, 2020 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-3232351), filed by Steven Joseph Klein. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(mg)
October 9, 2020 PA State Bar status verified as active for Karl E. Osterhout not admitted to this court - Local counsel required. (mg)
October 9, 2020 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Karl E. Osterhout: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall associate local counsel qualified to practice in the United States District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee. Local counsel shall electronically file a Notice of Appearance (LR 83.01(d)). Appearance by local counsel due by 10/30/2020. (mg)
October 9, 2020 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Karl E. Osterhout: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $100.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 10/30/2020. (mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Klein v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Joseph Klein
Represented By: Karl E. Osterhout
Represented By: Robert Scott Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA-Email Notification
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Bert Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?