Jones v. Harold
Plaintiff: Paul Eugene Jones
Defendant: Bill Harold
Case Number: 1:2020cv00073
Filed: November 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: In light of the Court's explicit warning to Plaintiff that failure to show cause or to keep the Court apprised of his current address would likely result in this actions dismissal (Doc. No. 4 at 2), and pursuant to the Court's well settled... authority to dismiss sua sponte a lawsuit for failure to prosecute, Carpenter v. City of Flint, 723 F.3d 700, 704 (6th Cir. 2013), this action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to Plaintiff's ability to pursue appropriate relief in habeas corpus. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 1/5/2021. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
December 14, 2020 Filing 6 Regular Mail Returned to Sender, Not Deliverable as Addressed, Unable to Forward. Docket sheet and filing forms returned. Mail sent to Paul Eugene Jones (am)
December 8, 2020 Filing 5 Regular Mail Returned to Sender, Not Deliverable as Addressed, Unable to Forward. #4 Order on Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Mail sent to Paul Eugene Jones. (am)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER denying #2 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Within 30 DAYS of the entry of this Order, Plaintiff MUST SHOW CAUSE why the Complaint should not be dismissed without prejudice to his ability to pursue relief in habeas corpus. Plaintiff' response to this Order must include the docket number assigned to this case, No. 1:20-cv-00073. Plaintiff is cautioned that failure to comply with this Order (or seek an extension of time within which to do so) within the time frame specified, or failure to keep the Court apprised of his current address, will likely result in the dismissal of this action. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 11/23/2020. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
November 19, 2020 Notice mailed to pro se parties regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service form and Notice of Consent form included). (am)
November 18, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (am)
November 16, 2020 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Paul Eugene Jones. (am)
November 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bill Harold, filed by Paul Eugene Jones.(am) Modified Date on 11/18/2020 (am).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Harold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Eugene Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Harold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?