Sentry Insurance Company v. The Industrial Development Board of the City of Hohenwald, Tennessee
Plaintiff: Sentry Insurance Company and Sentry Mutual Insurance A Mutual Company
Defendant: The Industrial Development Board of the City of Hohenwald, Tennessee
Case Number: 1:2021cv00003
Filed: January 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Office: Columbia Office
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Referring Judge: Barbara D Holmes
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1391
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #12 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jared L. Elster is granted. Signed by Vicki Kinkade, Chief Deputy Clerk, on 3/28/21. (vk)
March 22, 2021 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Sentry Insurance Company. (Ashworth, Gail)
March 16, 2021 Filing 16 RECEIPT #34675061730 in the amount of $150.00 posted by Sentry Insurance Company for Jared Elster re #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (kc)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: The District Judge is provided notice that on March 8, 2021, Defendant filed a motion to dismiss #13 with memorandum in support #14 . The Clerk is directed to forward the motion to the Honorable William L. Campbell, Jr., District Judge for his consideration of Defendant's motion to dismiss. The initial case management conference remains scheduled for 2:30 p.m., April 12, 2021, unless otherwise ordered by the Court. The initial case management conference in this case will be held telephonically. Counsel should use the following dial-in information1 to participate in the telephonic initial case management conference: Dial-in number: 877-402-9753 Access Code: 3808663#. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 3/11/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)
March 10, 2021 TN State Bar status verified as active for Mark Ennis McGrady admitted to this court. (kc)
March 9, 2021 NJ State Bar status verified as active for Jared L. Elster not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (kc)
March 8, 2021 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Support of #13 MOTION to Dismiss filed by The Industrial Development Board of the City of Hohenwald, Tennessee . (McGrady, Mark)
March 8, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss by The Industrial Development Board of the City of Hohenwald, Tennessee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Incorporation)(McGrady, Mark)
March 5, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for attorney Jared L. Elster to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee not paid-due within 21 days) by Sentry Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Ashworth, Gail)
March 5, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Ennis McGrady on behalf of The Industrial Development Board of the City of Hohenwald, Tennessee (McGrady, Mark)
February 23, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS returned executed by Sentry Insurance Company. The Industrial Development Board of the City of Hohenwald, Tennessee served on 2/12/2021. (Ashworth, Gail)
February 3, 2021 Filing 9 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Sentry Insurance Company. (Ashworth, Gail)
February 2, 2021 Filing 8 Summons issued as to The Industrial Development Board of the City of Hohenwald, Tennessee. (Service packet returned to counsel by regular mail.) (kc)
February 2, 2021 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#7 : The form for the Business Entity Disclosure Statement was not used. Counsel shall re-file the document using the form on the Court's website under the Forms section. Counsel shall use the event Business Entity Disclosure Statement under Other Documents when filing this document. (kc)
February 1, 2021 Filing 7 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Sentry Insurance Company. (Ashworth, Gail)
February 1, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Summons to be Issued as to Sentry Insurance Company. (Ashworth, Gail)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 1/29/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)
January 29, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference is set for 4/12/2021 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 764 before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (kc)
January 29, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (kc)
January 29, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (kc)
January 29, 2021 TN State Bar status verified as active for Gail Vaughn Ashworth admitted to this court. (kc)
January 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Industrial Development Board of the City of Hohenwald, Tennessee (Filing fee $402, Receipt number 0650-3303964), filed by Sentry Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Kanson Lease Agreement, #2 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(kc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sentry Insurance Company v. The Industrial Development Board of the City of Hohenwald, Tennessee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Industrial Development Board of the City of Hohenwald, Tennessee
Represented By: Mark Ennis McGrady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sentry Insurance Company
Represented By: Gail Vaughn Ashworth
Represented By: Jared L. Elster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sentry Mutual Insurance A Mutual Company
Represented By: Gail Vaughn Ashworth
Represented By: Jared L. Elster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?