Pratt v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Edward Andrew Pratt
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Interested Party: SSA-Email Notification
Case Number: 1:2021cv00041
Filed: June 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Referring Judge: Barbara D Holmes
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Attorney General/USA on 6/21/2021. (kc)
June 30, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed Social Security Administration served on 6/21/2021. (kc)
June 25, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to US Attorney's Office on 6/23/2021. (kc)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #5 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motion for Melissa A. Palmer to Appear Pro Hac Vice is granted. Signed by Lynda M. Hill, Clerk of Court, on 06/17/2021. (lh)
June 17, 2021 TN State Bar status verified as active for William M. Kaludis admitted to this court. (kc)
June 15, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Service copies forwarded to U.S. Marshals to effect service. (ln)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Cost (Docket No. #2 ) is GRANTED. This action is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge to enter a scheduling order for the management of the case to dispose or recommend disposition of any pretrial motions under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B), and to conduct further proceedings, if necessary, under Rule 72(b), Fed.R.Civ.P., and Local Rules of Court. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 6/15/2021. (ln)
June 15, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by William M. Kaludis on behalf of Edward Andrew Pratt (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Service)(Kaludis, William)
June 15, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for attorney Melissa A. Palmer to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3391510) by Edward Andrew Pratt. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Palmer, Melissa)
June 15, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (hb)
June 15, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (hb)
June 15, 2021 NY State Bar status verified as active for Melissa A. Palmer not admitted to this court - Local counsel required. (hb)
June 15, 2021 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Melissa A. Palmer: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $150.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 7/6/2021. (hb)
June 15, 2021 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Melissa A. Palmer: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall associate local counsel qualified to practice in the United States District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee. Local counsel shall electronically file a Notice of Appearance (LR 83.01(d)). Appearance by local counsel due by 7/6/2021. (hb)
June 9, 2021 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Edward Andrew Pratt. (hb)
June 9, 2021 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration, filed by Edward Andrew Pratt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Appeals Council Action, #2 Attachment Letter to the Clerk, #3 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(hb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pratt v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA-Email Notification
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Andrew Pratt
Represented By: William M. Kaludis
Represented By: Melissa A. Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?