Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Lewis & Clarke's LLC et al
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., House of Cash, Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc. doing business as EMI Longitude Music, Pie Eyed Groobee Music, Escatawpa Songs, LLC, Curb Records, Inc. doing business as Mike Curb Music, H W III Publishing and Sony/ATV Songs LLC
Defendant: Lewis & Clarke's LLC doing business as Lewis & Clarke's Restaurant and Michael Anthony
Case Number: 1:2022cv00017
Filed: May 24, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Referring Judge: Barbara D Holmes
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 0101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2022 Filing 19 SUMMONS returned executed by Songs of Universal, Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., H W III Publishing, Escatawpa Songs, LLC, Curb Records, Inc., Broadcast Music, Inc., Pie Eyed Groobee Music, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, House of Cash, Inc.. Lewis & Clarke's LLC served on 6/17/2022. (McFarland, Ian)
June 23, 2022 Filing 18 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Sony/ATV Songs LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Schedule A)(McFarland, Ian)
June 23, 2022 Filing 17 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by H W III Publishing. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Schedule A)(McFarland, Ian)
June 23, 2022 Filing 16 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Curb Records, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Schedule A)(McFarland, Ian)
June 23, 2022 Filing 15 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Escatawpa Songs, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Schedule A)(McFarland, Ian)
June 23, 2022 Filing 14 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Pie Eyed Groobee Music. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Schedule A)(McFarland, Ian)
June 23, 2022 Filing 13 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by EMI Consortium Songs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Schedule A)(McFarland, Ian)
June 23, 2022 Filing 12 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by House of Cash, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Schedule A)(McFarland, Ian)
June 23, 2022 Filing 11 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Songs of Universal, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Schedule A)(McFarland, Ian)
June 23, 2022 Filing 10 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Broadcast Music, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Schedule A)(McFarland, Ian)
June 15, 2022 Reset Hearing: The Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone is reset for 9/22/2022 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (ln)
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Before the Court is Plaintiffs' motion to continue the initial case management conference (Docket Entry No. #8 ), which is GRANTED as provided below. Plaintiffs must, by no later than August 26, 2022, file a return of service evidencing that Defendants have been served with process. The initial case management conference is RESCHEDULED from June 21, 2022, to 10:00 a.m., Thursday, September 22, 2022, by telephone conference, using the Court's conference line at 1-877-402-9753, access code 3808663#. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 6/14/2022.(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ln)
June 14, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference by Broadcast Music, Inc., Curb Records, Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., Escatawpa Songs, LLC, H W III Publishing, House of Cash, Inc., Pie Eyed Groobee Music, Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony/ATV Songs LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(McFarland, Ian)
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 5/25/2022. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ln)
May 24, 2022 Filing 6 Summons issued as to Michael Anthony and Lewis & Clarke's LLC. Service copies will be returned to counsel by regular mail. (ln)
May 24, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 6/21/2022 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (ln)
May 24, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (ln)
May 24, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (ln)
May 24, 2022 Filing 2 PLAINTIFFS' CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Broadcast Music, Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc. (ln)
May 24, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Michael Anthony and Lewis & Clarke's LLC (Filing fee $402, Receipt number ATNMDC-3600318) filed by Songs of Universal, Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., H W III Publishing, Escatawpa Songs, LLC, Curb Records, Inc., Broadcast Music, Inc., Pie Eyed Groobee Music, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, House of Cash, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Schedule, #2 Attachment 1 - Civil Cover Sheet)(ln)
May 24, 2022 TN State Bar status verified as active for Ian Garrett McFarland admitted to this court. (ln)
May 24, 2022 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#2 : The form for the Business Entity Disclosure Statement was not used. Counsel shall re-file the document using the form on the Court's website under the Forms section. Counsel shall use the event Business Entity Disclosure Statement under Other Documents when filing this document. (ln)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Lewis & Clarke's LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc.
Represented By: Ian Garrett McFarland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Songs of Universal, Inc.
Represented By: Ian Garrett McFarland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: House of Cash, Inc.
Represented By: Ian Garrett McFarland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMI Consortium Songs, Inc. doing business as EMI Longitude Music
Represented By: Ian Garrett McFarland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pie Eyed Groobee Music
Represented By: Ian Garrett McFarland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Escatawpa Songs, LLC
Represented By: Ian Garrett McFarland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curb Records, Inc. doing business as Mike Curb Music
Represented By: Ian Garrett McFarland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H W III Publishing
Represented By: Ian Garrett McFarland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sony/ATV Songs LLC
Represented By: Ian Garrett McFarland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lewis & Clarke's LLC doing business as Lewis & Clarke's Restaurant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Anthony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?