Aloyo v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Nicholas Elliott Aloyo
Defendant: Dr. Kilolo Kijakazi
Interested Party: SSA-Email Notification
Case Number: 1:2023cv00051
Filed: August 24, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Barbara D Holmes
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2023 IL State Bar status verified as active for Adam R. Sorkin admitted to this court. Local counsel waived. (kc)
October 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: In accordance with Rules 5 and 6 of the Supplemental Rules and to facilitate review of the administrative decision, the plaintiff is directed to file a brief for the requested relief within thirty (30) days of the date on which the Commissioner filed its answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 10/17/2023. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)
October 16, 2023 Filing 6 SSA Administrative Record filed per #1 Complaint,.. (Sorkin, Adam)
October 16, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam R. Sorkin on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi (Sorkin, Adam)
August 25, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT OF THE PARTIES TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE IN SOCIAL SECURITY CASES ARISING UNDER 42 U.S.C. 405(g). (af)
August 25, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (af)
August 25, 2023 TN State Bar status verified as active for Eugene Raymond Hallworth admitted to this court. (af)
August 24, 2023 Filing 2 ***DISREGARD***NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (af) Modified on 8/25/2023 (af).
August 24, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi (Filing fee $402, Receipt number ATNMDC-3897219), filed by Nicholas Elliott Aloyo. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Appeals Council Decision 6-22-23, #2 Attachment Administrative Law Judge Decision 8-3-22, #3 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(af)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aloyo v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Elliott Aloyo
Represented By: Eugene Raymond Hallworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Adam R. Sorkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA-Email Notification
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?