Taylor v. Bullard et al
Plaintiff: Corey Taylor
Defendant: Sebastian Bullard and Kenneth Smith
Case Number: 1:2024cv00052
Filed: May 16, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Plaintiff's certified inmate account statement #2 is months out of date and does not, as required, cover the six-month period preceding filing of the Complaint. The Court will allow Plaintiff to submit a more current certified trust account statement within 30 DAYS of the date this Order appears on the docket. Signed by Chief Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 6/18/2024. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)
June 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Permission for Leave to File Emergency Hearing Notice for TRO by Corey Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Proposed Order, #2 Attachment - Petition for Permission for Leave to File Emergency Petition for TRO/Injunctive Relief, #3 Attachment - Written Certification of "Efforts Made to Give Notice of the Request for a TRO", #4 Attachment - Affidavit)(am)
May 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (am)
May 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (am)
May 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Corey Taylor. (am)
May 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sebastian Bullard, Kenneth Smith, filed by Corey Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Disciplinary Reports)(am)
May 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Notice mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service form and Notice of Consent form included.) (am)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. Bullard et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sebastian Bullard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corey Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?