Cravens v. Smith et al
Plaintiff: James Cravens
Defendant: Greg Hicks, Dan Harding, Mark Parsons, Tony Choate and Faye Smith
Case Number: 2:2012cv00119
Filed: December 26, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Office: Cookeville Office
County: Fentress
Presiding Judge: E. Clifton Knowles
Presiding Judge: Kevin H. Sharp
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER: Report and Recommendation 76 is hereby ACCEPTED and APPROVED. The Motion for Summary Judgment filed on Behalf of Defendants Tony Choate, Dan Harding, Mark Parsons, and Greg Hicks, in their Individual Capacities 66 is hereby GRANTED. Defend ant Faye Smith's Motion for Summary Judgment 72 is hereby GRANTED. All other pending motions 62 and 65 are hereby TERMINATED as moot. This case is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The Clerk is directed to enter Judgment in a separate document in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 58. Signed by District Judge Kevin H. Sharp on 4/3/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
February 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 76 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: Magistrate Judge Knowles RECOMMENDS that Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment 66 and 72 be GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 2/10/14. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
July 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER denying 40 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 7/15/13. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(la)
April 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER denying 29 Motion for lien's to be placed on the named defendants in this case, property and bank accounts, and their names to secure any future judgments in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 4/26/13. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
April 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 SCHEDULING ORDER: Motion to Amend Pleadings due by 6/28/2013. Discovery due by 10/29/2013. Dispositive Motions due by 11/29/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 4/22/13. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
March 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 18 DENIAL OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT: Pending is Plaintiffs Motion/Petition for Default Judgment and Status of Case against Defendants 13 . The motion for default is denied for the reasons stated below. Defendant Faye Smith filed an Answer on 3/19/2013 and de fault is inappropriate against her. Defendants Choate, Harding, Parsons, and Hicks filed a Motion for Extension of Time 14 on 3/21/2103 and on 3/22/2013, the Court granted Defendants' motion 15 . Defendants were given until 4/19/2013, to re spond to the Complaint against them. Accordingly, the Clerk declines to enter default. Plaintiff's motion is denied. Signed by Clerk of Court Keith Throckmorton on 3/26/13. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cravens v. Smith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Harding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Parsons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Choate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Faye Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Cravens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?