Stinson v. Due et al
Plaintiff: Bradley Stinson
Defendant: Brandon Due, Steven Hylsky, John Doe and White County, Tennessee
Case Number: 2:2018cv00078
Filed: September 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Joe Brown
Referring Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: Jury Trial set for 12/3/2019 at 9:00 AM in Cookeville before Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw Jr. Pretrial Conference set for 11/22/2019 at 10:00 AM in Cookeville before Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw Jr. Joint Proposed Pretrial Order due by 11/15/2019. Exhibit List and Witness List due by 11/15/2019. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 10/24/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jw)
October 19, 2018 GA State Bar status verified as active for Mario B. Williams; FL State Bar status verified as active for Dallas S. LePierre. (jw)
October 19, 2018 An Initial Case Management Order having been entered in this matter #14 , the Initial Case Management Conference set for 11:00 a.m. on November 8, 2018, in Cookeville, TN, is no longer necessary and will be removed from the Court's calendar. (rd)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Discovery due by 4/15/2019. Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 1/15/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 7/15/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 10/18/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jw)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion for atty Mario B. Williams to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #12 Motion for atty Dallas S. LePierre to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 10/17/18. (rd)
October 16, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for attorney(s) Dallas S. LePierre to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2775404) by Bradley Stinson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Attachment Proposed Order)(Stover, William)
October 16, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for attorney(s) Mario B. Williams to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2775399) by Bradley Stinson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Attachment Proposed Order)(Stover, William)
October 4, 2018 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Brandon Due, Steven Hylsky, White County, Tennessee, filed by Bradley Stinson.(Williams, Mario)
September 24, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joe Brown: Telephone Conference held on 9/24/2018. Text Order entered. (rd)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER A telephone conference call was held in this case as well as related case Stinson v. Farris et al 2:17cv-0057. The Clerk will file this order in that case as well. The parties will file a joint motion to dismiss the 2017 case as the 2018 case will replace it. Plaintiff may amend his complaint in the 2018 case to clarify the claim against the Defendant Hilsky. Service of process has been waived by three defendants. It is likely the statute of limitation has run on new defendants. Counsel will submit a draft scheduling order within 21 days to brownchambers@tnmd.uscours.gov. (JBB) Modified on 9/24/2018 (rd).
September 21, 2018 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Bradley Stinson. White County, Tennessee waiver sent on 9/17/2018. (Stover, William)
September 21, 2018 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Bradley Stinson. Steven Hylsky waiver sent on 9/17/2018. (Stover, William)
September 21, 2018 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Bradley Stinson. Brandon Due waiver sent on 9/17/2018. (Stover, William)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 9/7/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jw)
September 7, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/8/2018 at 11:00 AM in Cookeville before Magistrate Judge Joe Brown. (jw)
September 7, 2018 Filing 3 Summons issued as to Steven Hylsky, Bradley Stinson, White County, Tennessee. Service copies returned to counsel by mail. (jw)
September 6, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (jw)
September 6, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for William H. Stover. (jw)
September 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Doe, Brandon Due, Steven Hylsky, White County, Tennessee (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2745024), filed by Bradley Stinson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stinson v. Due et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Due
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Hylsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: White County, Tennessee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley Stinson
Represented By: William H. Stover
Represented By: Mario B. Williams
Represented By: Dallas S. LePierre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?