Holmes v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Stephanie M. Holmes
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Interested Party: SSA-Email Notification
Case Number: 2:2018cv00087
Filed: October 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Joe Brown
Referring Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Mercedes C. Maynor-Faulcon on behalf of Social Security Administration (Maynor-Faulcon, Mercedes)
October 23, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for Robert C. Wilson. (mg)
October 22, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert C. Wilson on behalf of Stephanie M. Holmes (Wilson, Robert)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: This action is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge to enter a scheduling order for the management of the case, to dispose or recommend disposition of any pretrial motions under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B), and to conduct further proceedings, if necessary, under Rule 72(b), Fed.R.Civ.P., and the Local Rules of Court. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 10/17/2018. (mg)
October 16, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail. (mg)
October 16, 2018 Filing 5 RECEIPT #34675050043 in the amount of $100.00 posted by Stephanie M. Holmes re #2 David F. Chermol Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (mg)
October 16, 2018 Filing 4 RECEIPT #34675052242 in the amount of $400.00 posted by Stephanie M. Holmes re #1 Social Security Complaint. (mg)
October 10, 2018 PA State Bar status verified as active for David F. Chermol. (mg)
October 10, 2018 NOTICE TO COUNSEL David F. Chermol: WITHIN 14 DAYS, counsel shall associate local counsel qualified to practice in the United States District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee. Local counsel shall electronically file a Notice of Appearance (LR 83.01(d)). Appearance by local counsel due by 10/24/2018. (mg)
October 10, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg)
October 6, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for attorney(s) David F. Chermol to Appear Pro Hac Vice ($100 Fee Paid) by Stephanie M. Holmes. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Attachment - Proposed Order)(mg) Modified text on 10/16/2018 (mg). (Main Document 2 replaced on 10/16/2018) (mg). (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/16/2018) (mg). (Attachment 2 replaced on 10/16/2018) (mg).
October 6, 2018 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration ($400 Filing Fee Paid), filed by Stephanie M. Holmes. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(mg) Modified text on 10/16/2018 (mg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holmes v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie M. Holmes
Represented By: David F. Chermol
Represented By: Robert C. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA-Email Notification
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Mercedes C. Maynor-Faulcon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?