Maddle v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Frank Maddle
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Interested Party: SSA-Email Notification
Case Number: 2:2018cv00088
Filed: October 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Joe Brown
Referring Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:0405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Service copies at intake to be picked up by counsel. (jw)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Doc. No. 2) is GRANTED. This action is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 10/17/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jw)
October 15, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (jw)
October 15, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for John W. Allen. (jw)
October 13, 2018 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Frank Maddle. (jw)
October 13, 2018 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration filed by Frank Maddle. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jw) (Main Document 1 replaced on 10/16/2018) (jw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maddle v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA-Email Notification
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Maddle
Represented By: John W. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?