Fitzgerald Truck Parts and Sales, LLC v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Fitzgerald Truck Parts and Sales, LLC
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2019cv00008
Filed: February 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Alistair Newbern
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7422
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to United States of America on February 27, 2019 by Fitzgerald Truck Parts and Sales, LLC. (Sims, W.)
February 27, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Donald Q. Cochran on 02/19/2019 by Fitzgerald Truck Parts and Sales, LLC. (Sims, W.)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Kendall C. Jones to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Vicki R. Kinkade on 2/20/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jw)
February 15, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT re #2 MOTION for attorney Kendall C. Jones to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2848604) by Fitzgerald Truck Parts and Sales, LLC. (Sims, W.)
February 14, 2019 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: The pending pro hac vice motion (Docket No. 2) does not comply with the Court's local rules, because the motion fails to state whether any disciplinary proceedings or criminal charges have been instituted against the attorney seeking pro hac vice admission. Local Rule 83.01(b)(2). By no later than five (5) business days from the date of this docket annotation, the pro hac vice motion must be supplemented by the filing of a statement under oath of the attorney seeking pro hac vice admission disclosing whether any disciplinary proceedings or criminal charges have been instituted against the attorney, and if so, providing complete details about the proceeding or charges, including outcome. Failure to do so will result in denial of the pro hac vice motion. (jw)
February 14, 2019 Filing 8 Summons issued as to United States of America. Service copies to be picked up by counsel. (jw)
February 14, 2019 Filing 7 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Fitzgerald Truck Parts and Sales, LLC. (jw)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 2/11/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jw)
February 7, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/10/2019 at 9:30 AM in Cookeville before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (jw)
February 7, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (jw)
February 7, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (jw)
February 7, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for W. Scott Sims; DC Bar status verified as active for Kendall C. Jones. (jw)
February 7, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for attorney Kendall C. Jones to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2848604) by Fitzgerald Truck Parts and Sales, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Good Standing Certificate)(Sims, W.)
February 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2848004) filed by Fitzgerald Truck Parts and Sales, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - IRS Letter to Fitzgerald, #3 Exhibit 2 - Mediator's Report, #4 Exhibit 3 - Refund Claims, #5 Exhibit 4 - Notices of Claim Disallowance)(jw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fitzgerald Truck Parts and Sales, LLC v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fitzgerald Truck Parts and Sales, LLC
Represented By: W. Scott Sims
Represented By: Kendall C. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?