Thrasher v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of

Plaintiff: Hollis Allen Thrasher
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Interested Party: SSA-Email Notification
Case Number: 2:2019cv00010
Filed: February 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Barbara D Holmes
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the motion to appear pro hac vice (Doc. No. #5 ) of Bert W. Coleman is GRANTED. Signed by Vicki R. Kinkade, Acting Clerk of Court on 3/19/2019. (jm)
March 15, 2019 KS State Bar status verified as active for Bert Coleman. (jm) Modified on 3/20/2019 (jm).
March 14, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Bert Coleman on behalf of Social Security Administration, Commissioner of (Coleman, Bert)
March 14, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for attorney Bert W. Coleman to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee Waived) by Social Security Administration, Commissioner of. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing - District of Kansas)(Coleman, Bert) Modified on 3/15/2019 (jm).
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: This action is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge to enter a scheduling order for the management of the case, to dispose or recommend disposition of any pretrial motions under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B), and to conduct further proceedings, if necessary, under Rule 72(b), Fed.R.Civ.P., and the Local Rules of Court. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 2/26/19. (dt)
February 15, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, Commissioner of, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Service copies returned to counsel by mail.) (jm)
February 15, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Donna Simpson. (jm)
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (jm)
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Nancy A. Berryhill, Acting Commissioner of Social Security Administration (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2854214), filed by Hollis Allen Thrasher. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet) (jm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thrasher v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hollis Allen Thrasher
Represented By: Donna Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Represented By: Bert Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA-Email Notification
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?