Lagan v. Windle
Plaintiff: Seamus Lagan
Defendant: John Mark Windle
Case Number: 2:2019cv00050
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Alistair Newbern
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for William Paxson Purcell, III. (jm)
August 5, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by William Paxson Purcell, III on behalf of John Mark Windle (Purcell, William)
July 31, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for William J. Harbison, II and Ronald G. Harris. (jm)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Pursuant to the agreement of the Parties, Defendant John Mark Windle shall have an extension of time up to and including August 30, 2019 in which to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. It is therefore ORDERED that Defendant John Mark Windle shall have until August 30, 2019 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 7/29/2019. (jm)
July 29, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald G. Harris on behalf of John Mark Windle (Harris, Ronald)
July 29, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by John Mark Windle. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Proposed Order))(Harbison, William)
July 29, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by William J. Harbison, II on behalf of John Mark Windle (Harbison, William)
July 15, 2019 Filing 7 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Seamus Lagan. (VanAusdall, Jacob)
July 11, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS returned executed by Seamus Lagan. John Mark Windle served on 7/9/2019. (VanAusdall, Jacob)
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/23/2019 at 11:30 AM in Cookeville before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (jm)
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 Summons issued as to John Mark Windle. (Service copies returned to counsel by regular mail.) (jm)
July 3, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Todd G. Cole and Jacob C. VanAusdall. (jm)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (jm)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REFERRING CASE: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 7/2/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(hb)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Mark Windle (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650- 2943188), filed by Seamus Lagan. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - WATE News Article, #3 Exhibit B - Letter from Defendant Windle) (jm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lagan v. Windle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seamus Lagan
Represented By: Todd G. Cole
Represented By: Jacob C. VanAusdall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Mark Windle
Represented By: William Paxson Purcell, III
Represented By: Ronald G. Harris
Represented By: William J. Harbison, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?