Hayes v. Hampton
Petitioner: Ronald C Hayes
Respondent: Kevin Hampton
Case Number: 2:2019cv00074
Filed: September 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Office: Cookeville Office
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Alistair Newbern
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Filing 9 Case transferred in from the District of Tennessee Eastern; Case Number 3:18-cv-00404. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 30, 2019 Case transferred electronically to District of Middle District of Tennessee. (BJL) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 9/30/2019.]
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: As the Court is authorized to transfer a case such this to another District in the interest of justice, 28 U.S.C. 1406(a), the Clerk is DIRECTED to transfer this action to the Northeastern Division of the United States District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee, at Cookeville and to close this file. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 9/30/2019. (BJL)* [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 9/30/2019.]
February 22, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by John H Bledsoe, III on behalf of Kevin Hampton (Bledsoe, John) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 9/30/2019.]
February 11, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Attorney Withdrawal Attorney Nicholas S Bolduc terminated. (Bledsoe, John) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 9/30/2019.]
January 29, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, by Kevin Hampton.(Bolduc, Nicholas) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 9/30/2019.]
January 29, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING w/certificate of service and INDEX OF RECORD of Rule 5 materials submitted by Attorney General containing 4 volumes of transcript. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Technical Record on Coram Nobis Proceedings, #2 Exhibit Brief of Appellant on Coram Nobis Proceedings, #3 Exhibit Brief of State on Coram Nobis Proceedings, #4 Exhibit Opinion of the Tennessee Court of Criminal Appeals on Coram Nobis Proceedings)(Bolduc, Nicholas) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 9/30/2019.]
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Ronald C Hayes. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to serve copies of the 2254 petition [Doc. 1] and this order upon Warden Kevin Hampton (Respondent) and the Attorney General for the State of Tennessee. Accordingly, Respondent hereby is ORDERED to file an answer or other response to the motion within thirty days from entry of this Order. See Rule 5 of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Proceedings. Although a reply to the answer is not necessary, if Petitioner wishes to submit a reply he shall file that reply within thirty days from the date Respondent files an answer or other response with the Court. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 1/3/2019. (BJL, )* Mailed this order and #1 Petition to Kevin Hampton and to The Attorney General for the State of Tennessee. Modified on 1/3/2019 (BJL, ). [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 9/30/2019.]
September 25, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas S Bolduc on behalf of Kevin Hampton (Bolduc, Nicholas) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 9/30/2019.]
September 21, 2018 District Judge Travis R McDonough and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (BJL, ) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 9/30/2019.]
September 21, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 0649-3775288.), filed by Ronald C Hayes. (Attachments: #1 Other Memorandum of Law In Support of Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #2 Appendix Appendix to Memorandum of Law in Support of Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus)(Trant, Douglas) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 9/30/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hayes v. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kevin Hampton
Represented By: Nicholas S. Bolduc
Represented By: John H. Bledsoe, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ronald C Hayes
Represented By: Douglas A. Trant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?