Ledbetter v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Cassie Nichole Ledbetter
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Interested Party: SSA-Email Notification
Case Number: 2:2019cv00079
Filed: October 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Robert Scott Wilson. (gb)
October 29, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Scott Wilson on behalf of Cassie Nichole Ledbetter (Wilson, Robert)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Karl Osterhout to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 10/29/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
October 28, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for attorney Karl Osterhout to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3020035) by Cassie Nichole Ledbetter. (Attachments: #1 Attachment WD CGS, #2 Attachment CGS Supreme Court, #3 Attachment Proposed Order)(Osterhout, Karl)
October 24, 2019 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Karl E. Osterhout: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall associate local counsel qualified to practice in the United States District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee. Local counsel shall electronically file a Notice of Appearance (LR 83.01(d)). Appearance by local counsel due by 11/14/2019. (gb)
October 24, 2019 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Karl E. Osterhout: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $100.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 11/14/2019. (gb)
October 24, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (gb)
October 24, 2019 PA State Bar status verified as active for Karl E. Osterhout. (gb)
October 23, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Cassie Nichole Ledbetter. (gb)
October 23, 2019 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration, filed by Cassie Nichole Ledbetter. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(gb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ledbetter v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cassie Nichole Ledbetter
Represented By: Karl E. Osterhout
Represented By: Robert Scott Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA-Email Notification
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?