Maxwell v. American General Life Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Wilbur Maxwell
Defendant: American International Group, Inc. and American General Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv00100
Filed: December 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Alistair Newbern
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING CASE FOR TRIAL: Jury Trial is set for 11/16/2021 at 09:00 AM in Cookeville before Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw Jr. Pretrial Conference is set for 11/5/2021 at 09:00 AM in Cookeville before Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw Jr. Exhibit List due by 10/29/2021. Witness List due by 10/29/2021. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 10/29/2021. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 2/12/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(vh)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INTIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 7/31/2020. Discovery due by 7/31/2020. Dispositive motions due by 5/14/2021. Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 7/8/2020 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. The parties shall call (888) 557-8511 and enter access code 7819165# to participate. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 2/10/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(vh)
February 10, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern: Initial Case Management Conference held on 2/10/2020. (Hearing lasted :14)(tm)
February 6, 2020 Filing 10 JOINT PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by Wilbur Maxwell. (Hight, Justin) Modified on 2/7/2020 (vh).
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01. Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 12/26/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(gb)
December 20, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Case Management Conference RESET for 2/10/2020 at 11:00 AM in Cookeville before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (gb)
December 19, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by American General Life Insurance Company, American International Group, Inc. (Drinkwater, William)
December 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/13/2020 at 10:30 AM in Cookeville before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (gb)
December 19, 2019 Filing 5 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by American International Group, Inc. (Drinkwater, William)
December 19, 2019 Filing 4 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by American General Life Insurance Company. (Drinkwater, William)
December 19, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for William W. Drinkwater and Justin Hight. (gb)
December 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (gb)
December 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (gb)
December 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by American General Life Insurance Company, American International Group, Inc. from Circuit Court of Putnam County, case number 2019CV237. (Filing fee paid $400 receipt number 0650-3053477) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Copy of Process and Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Notice of Removal, #3 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(gb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maxwell v. American General Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American International Group, Inc.
Represented By: William W. Drinkwater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American General Life Insurance Company
Represented By: William W. Drinkwater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilbur Maxwell
Represented By: Justin Hight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?