Evanston Insurance Company v. ECE Services, PLLC
Plaintiff: Evanston Insurance Company
Counter Plaintiff: ECE Services, PLLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00101
Filed: December 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Alistair Newbern
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Daniel H. Rader, IV and Andre S. Greppin. (vh)
January 31, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Andre S. Greppin on behalf of ECE Services, PLLC (Greppin, Andre)
January 31, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Evanston Insurance Company by ECE Services, PLLC.(Rader, Daniel)
January 31, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel H. Rader, IV on behalf of All Defendants (Rader, Daniel)
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 12/26/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jw)
December 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/13/2020 at 1:00 PM in Cookeville before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (jw)
December 26, 2019 Filing 4 Summons issued as to ECE Services, PLLC. Service copies returned to counsel by mail. (jw)
December 26, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (jw)
December 26, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (jw)
December 26, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Heather Gwinn Pabon. (jw)
December 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ECE Services, PLLC (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-3054356), filed by Evanston Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Claims Commisson Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - State Court Summons, #4 Exhibit C - Insurance Policy)(jw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evanston Insurance Company v. ECE Services, PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evanston Insurance Company
Represented By: Heather Gwinn Pabon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter plaintiff: ECE Services, PLLC
Represented By: Daniel H. Rader, IV
Represented By: Andre S. Greppin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?