Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Spankies, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc., Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Muscle Shoals Sound Publishing Co., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., Cyanide Publishing, Songs of Universal, Inc., Peermusic III LTD., House of Cash, Inc., House of Bryant Publications, LLC, Bocephus Music, Inc. and Sinnerlina
Defendant: Jon Josephson and Spankies, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv00001
Filed: January 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Alistair Newbern
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:0101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 1/14/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(vh)
January 13, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS returned executed by Broadcast Music, Inc.. Jon Josephson served on 1/11/2020. (McFarland, Ian)
January 13, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS returned executed by Broadcast Music, Inc.. Spankies, LLC served on 1/10/2020. (McFarland, Ian)
January 8, 2020 Filing 6 Summons issued as to Jon Josephson and Spankies, LLC. (gb)
January 8, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/13/2020 at 01:30 PM in Cookeville before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (gb)
January 8, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Ian Garrett McFarland, R. Bradford Brittian and John T. Winemiller. (gb)
January 8, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (gb)
January 8, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (gb)
January 7, 2020 Filing 2 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Broadcast Music, Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., Peermusic III LTD., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony/ATV Songs LLC. (gb)
January 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jon Josephson, Spankies, LLC (Filing fee paid $400, Receipt number 0650-3061597), filed by EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., Muscle Shoals Sound Publishing Co., Cyanide Publishing, Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Broadcast Music, Inc., House of Bryant Publications, LLC, Peermusic III LTD., House of Cash, Inc., Sinnerlina, Bocephus Music, Inc. Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Schedule, #2 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(gb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Spankies, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc.
Represented By: Ian Garrett McFarland
Represented By: R. Bradford Brittian
Represented By: John T. Winemiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sony/ATV Songs LLC
Represented By: Ian Garrett McFarland
Represented By: R. Bradford Brittian
Represented By: John T. Winemiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Muscle Shoals Sound Publishing Co.
Represented By: Ian Garrett McFarland
Represented By: R. Bradford Brittian
Represented By: John T. Winemiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMI Consortium Songs, Inc.
Represented By: Ian Garrett McFarland
Represented By: R. Bradford Brittian
Represented By: John T. Winemiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cyanide Publishing
Represented By: Ian Garrett McFarland
Represented By: R. Bradford Brittian
Represented By: John T. Winemiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Songs of Universal, Inc.
Represented By: Ian Garrett McFarland
Represented By: R. Bradford Brittian
Represented By: John T. Winemiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peermusic III LTD.
Represented By: Ian Garrett McFarland
Represented By: R. Bradford Brittian
Represented By: John T. Winemiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: House of Cash, Inc.
Represented By: Ian Garrett McFarland
Represented By: R. Bradford Brittian
Represented By: John T. Winemiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: House of Bryant Publications, LLC
Represented By: Ian Garrett McFarland
Represented By: R. Bradford Brittian
Represented By: John T. Winemiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bocephus Music, Inc.
Represented By: Ian Garrett McFarland
Represented By: R. Bradford Brittian
Represented By: John T. Winemiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sinnerlina
Represented By: Ian Garrett McFarland
Represented By: R. Bradford Brittian
Represented By: John T. Winemiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Josephson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spankies, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?