Fitzgerald Truck Parts and Sales, LLC v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Fitzgerald Truck Parts and Sales, LLC
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2020cv00026
Filed: May 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Alistair Newbern
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7422
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Donald Q. Cochran on 05/18/2020 by Fitzgerald Truck Parts and Sales, LLC. (Sims, W.)
May 18, 2020 DC Bar status verified as active for Kendall C. Jones, and GA State Bar status verified as active for Rebecca M. Stork. (mg)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Rebecca M. Stork to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 5/18/20. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Kendall C. Jones to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 5/18/20. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
May 15, 2020 Filing 12 DECLARATION of Rebecca M. Stork filed by Fitzgerald Truck Parts and Sales, LLC re: #9 MOTION for attorney Rebecca M. Stork to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3141295). (Stork, Rebecca)
May 15, 2020 Filing 11 DECLARATION of Kendall C. Jones filed by Fitzgerald Truck Parts and Sales, LLC re: #7 MOTION for attorney Kendall C. Jones to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3141284). (Jones, Kendall)
May 15, 2020 NOTICE TO FILER re DE# [ #7 #9 ]: The pending pro hac vice motion does not comply with the Court's local rules, because the motion fails to state whether disciplinary proceedings by any disciplinary authority, a finding of contempt or a sanction under 28 U.S.C. 1927 by any court, or criminal charges have been instituted against the attorney seeking pro hac vice admission. Local Rule 83.01(b)(2). By no later than five (5) business days from the date of this docket annotation, the pro hac vice motion must be supplemented by the filing of a statement under oath of the attorney seeking pro hac vice admission disclosing such matters. Failure to do so will result in denial of the pro hac vice motion. (Davies, Kirk)
May 14, 2020 Filing 10 DECLARATION of Rebecca M. Stork filed by Fitzgerald Truck Parts and Sales, LLC re: #9 MOTION for attorney Rebecca M. Stork to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3141295). (Stork, Rebecca)
May 14, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for attorney Rebecca M. Stork to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3141295) by Fitzgerald Truck Parts and Sales, LLC. (Stork, Rebecca)
May 14, 2020 Filing 8 DECLARATION of Kendall C. Jones filed by Fitzgerald Truck Parts and Sales, LLC re: #7 MOTION for attorney Kendall C. Jones to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3141284). (Jones, Kendall)
May 14, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for attorney Kendall C. Jones to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3141284) by Fitzgerald Truck Parts and Sales, LLC. (Jones, Kendall)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01(h). Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 5/11/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
May 7, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/17/2020 at 11:30 AM in Cookeville before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (mg)
May 7, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to United States of America (U.S. Attorney). Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail. (Due to the COVID-19, counsel will not be able to pick-up Summons as requested.) (mg)
May 7, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg)
May 7, 2020 Filing 2 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Fitzgerald Truck Parts and Sales, LLC. (mg)
May 7, 2020 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Kendall C. Jones, and Rebecca M. Stork: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $100.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 5/28/2020. (mg)
May 7, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for W. Scott Sims, D.C. Bar status verified as active for Kendall C. Jones, and GA State Bar status verified as active for Rebecca M. Stork. (mg)
May 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-3136953), filed by Fitzgerald Truck Parts and Sales, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - March 20, 1998 Letter, #2 Exhibit 2 - Mediators Report, #3 Exhibit 3 - Refund Claims, #4 Exhibit 4 - Notices of Disallowance, #5 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fitzgerald Truck Parts and Sales, LLC v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fitzgerald Truck Parts and Sales, LLC
Represented By: Rebecca M. Stork
Represented By: W. Scott Sims
Represented By: Kendall C. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?