Purvey v. Advance Self Storage LLC et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Earl Purvey, Jr.
Defendant: Crossville Police Department, Casey Cox, Tennessee Highway Safety Patrol, Herbert Slatery, III, Advance Self Storage LLC and Cumberland County Sheriff's Department
Case Number: 2:2020cv00041
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Alistair Newbern
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Pro se Plaintiff Joseph Earl Purvey, Jr., initiated this action on July 17, 2020, by filing a complaint under 42 U.S.C. 1983. In this case, it has come to the Court's attention that Purvey submitted several summonses to the Clerk's Office for signature, but only one was addressed to a defendant named in the complaint: Sheriff Cox. That summons has issued (Doc. No. #6 ) and Purvey is responsible for serving it on Cox, along with a copy of the complaint, before the deadline for service expires on October 15, 2020. The Court cannot issue summonses to any person or entity Purvey did not name in the complaint because there are no claims pending against them in this action. Nor can Purvey's claims against the defendants he did name go forward until they are properly served. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 9/3/2020. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(vh)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: This action is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge to enter a scheduling order for the management of the case, dispose or recommend disposition of any pretrial motions under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B), and conduct further proceedings, if necessary, under Rule 72 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules of Court. Plaintiff is responsible for effecting service of process on all Defendants in accordance with the Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 9/2/2020. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)
September 1, 2020 Filing 6 Summons issued as to Casey Cox. (vh)
September 1, 2020 Filing 5 RECEIPT #34675059851 in the amount of $400.00 posted by Joseph Earl Purvey, Jr filing fee for #1 Complaint. (vh)
August 19, 2020 Summons received, not issued per DE 4. (vh)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: To proceed in this action, Plaintiff MUST either pay the full $400.00 filing fee or file an application to proceed in this Court without prepaying fees and costs. Plaintiff's submission must be received in this Court within 30 DAYS of the date this Order is entered on the docket and include the assigned case number, 2:20-cv-00041. Plaintiff may request more time to comply before the deadline expires, if necessary. The Clerk is DIRECTED to mail Plaintiff a blank Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form). Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 7/24/2020. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail w/blank IFP long form. ) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(vh)
July 21, 2020 Notice mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service form included). (vh)
July 21, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (vh)
July 21, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (vh)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Advance Self Storage LLC, Casey Cox, Crossville Police Department, Cumberland County Sheriff's Department, Herbert Slatery, III, and Tennessee Highway Safety Patrol, filed by Joseph Earl Purvey, Jr. (Attachment: #1 Affidavit of Joseph Earl Purvey Jr.)(vh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Purvey v. Advance Self Storage LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crossville Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Casey Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tennessee Highway Safety Patrol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herbert Slatery, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advance Self Storage LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cumberland County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Earl Purvey, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?