Purvey v. Passon et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Earl Purvey, Jr.
Defendant: Casey Cox, David Passon, Bruce Bailey, Morgan Smith, Tennesse Highway Safety and Dakota Rucker
Case Number: 2:2020cv00042
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: Joseph Earl Purvey, Jr., a pro se Tennessee resident, filed a Complaint for Violation of Civil Rights. (Doc. No. 1.) Plaintiff did not, however, resolve the matter of the filing fee. To proceed in this action, Plaintiff MUST either pay the full $400.00 filing fee or file an application to proceed in this Court without prepaying fees and costs. Plaintiff's submission must be received in this Court within 30 DAYS of the date this Order is entered on the docket and include the assigned case number, 2:20-cv-00042. Plaintiff may request more time to comply before the deadline expires, if necessary. The Clerk is DIRECTED to mail Plaintiff a blank Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form). Plaintiff is warned that, if he does not follow these instructions within the required time period, the Court will dismiss this action for failure to prosecute. Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b). Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 8/21/2020. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (Pro se party sent blank IFP (long) form by regular mail.)(am)
July 28, 2020 NOTICE mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service form included). (am)
July 22, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (am)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bruce Bailey, Casey Cox, David Passon, Dakota Rucker, Morgan Smith, Tennesse Highway Safety, filed by Joseph Earl Purvey, Jr.(am)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Purvey v. Passon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Casey Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Passon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tennesse Highway Safety
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dakota Rucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Earl Purvey, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?