Mosley v. Ruby Tuesday, Inc.
Plaintiff: Christopher Phillip Mosley
Defendant: Ruby Tuesday, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00045
Filed: July 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Alistair Newbern
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS returned executed by Christopher Phillip Mosley. Ruby Tuesday, Inc. served on 9/2/2020. (Friauf, James)
July 24, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for James W. Friauf. (dt)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01(h). Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 7/23/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
July 23, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/19/2020 at 10:00 AM in Cookeville before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (dt) Modified on 7/24/2020 (dt).
July 23, 2020 Filing 4 Summons issued as to Ruby Tuesday, Inc. (Service copies returned to counsel by mail.) (dt)
July 23, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (dt) Modified on 7/24/2020 (dt).
July 23, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt) Modified on 7/24/2020 (dt).
July 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ruby Tuesday, Inc. (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-3181808), filed by Christopher Phillip Mosley. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mosley v. Ruby Tuesday, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruby Tuesday, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Phillip Mosley
Represented By: James W. Friauf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?