Dodson v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Aaron Dale Dodson
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Interested Party: SSA-Email Notification
Case Number: 2:2020cv00048
Filed: August 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Alistair Newbern
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for attorney Jeremiah D. Hayes to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee not paid-due within 21 days) by Social Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Hayes, Jeremiah)
September 9, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS returned executed as to Social Security Administration served on 8/24/2020. (dt)
September 9, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Attorney General/USA on 8/25/2020. (dt)
August 20, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to US Attorney/MDTN on 8/18/2020. (dt)
August 14, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (forwarded to USM for service) (vh)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: This action is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge to enter a scheduling order for the management of the case, to dispose or recommend disposition of any pretrial motions under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B), and to conduct further proceedings, if necessary, under Rule 72(b), Fed.R.Civ.P., and the Local Rules of Court. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 8/14/2020. (vh)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Plaintiff Aaron Dale Dodson has filed an application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. No. #2 ). Having considered Dodson's application, the Court ORDERS that Dodson be allowed to proceed in forma pauperis in this case. The Clerk is permitted to file the case and send copies to the U.S. Attorney for the Middle District of Tennessee and the Attorney General of the United States. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 8/14/2020. (vh) Modified on 8/14/2020 (vh).
August 10, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt)
August 10, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Matthew A. Jared. (dt)
August 7, 2020 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Aaron Dale Dodson. (dt)
August 7, 2020 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration, filed by Aaron Dale Dodson. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dodson v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Dale Dodson
Represented By: Matthew A. Jared
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA-Email Notification
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Jeremiah D. Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?