STAR Teams, Inc. v. Transplant Advocates, LLC
Plaintiff: STAR Teams, Inc.
Defendant: Transplant Advocates, LLC
Case Number: 2:2022cv00022
Filed: June 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Alistair Newbern
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ENTRY OF JUDGMENT re: #39 Order Dismissing Case. (kc)
July 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER DISMISSING CASE: The Court acknowledges that this action has been DISMISSED with prejudice #37 , and the Clerk is directed to close the file. Any pending motions are DENIED as moot. This Order shall constitute final judgment for purposes of Fed. R. Civ. P. 58. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 7/26/2022. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)
July 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER: The parties have filed a joint stipulation of dismissal with prejudice in this matter #37 . Accordingly, the initial case management conference set on July 28, 2022, is CANCELLED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 7/26/2022. (kc)
July 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STIPULATION of Dismissal [JOINT WITH PREJUDICE] by STAR Teams, Inc.. (Naylor, Andrew)
July 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #31 MOTION to Defer Consideration and Stay filed by Transplant Advocates, LLC. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 7/20/2022. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 STATUS REPORT (JOINT) AND JOINT MOTION TO CONTINUE OR SUSPEND DEADLINE by STAR Teams, Inc.. (Butcher, Jayme)
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER: On July 13, 2022, Defendant Transplant Advocates, LLC, filed a motion to dismiss plaintiff STAR Teams verified amended complaint under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6). #30 . Any filings made related to the motion to dismiss, including motions for extensions of time or to exceed page limits, shall be decided by Judge Richardson unless referred to the undersigned Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 7/15/2022. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 NOTICE by Transplant Advocates, LLC of Withdrawal of Counsel (Malone, Michael)
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER: Defendant has filed a Motion to Defer Consideration and Stay Proceedings on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Doc. No. #31 , "Motion"). Plaintiff shall file a response to the Motion on or before July 20, 2022. Additionally, in light of the filing of the Amended Complaint #29 , which has become the operative complaint in this case, Defendants' pending Motion to Dismiss #26 -which was directed at the original Complaint #1 -is DENIED as moot. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 7/14/2022. (kc)
July 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MOTION to Defer Consideration and Stay by Transplant Advocates, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Memorandum in Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A-STAR's First Request for Production of Documents to Defendant)(Malone, Michael)
July 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MOTION to Dismiss Verified Amended Complaint by Transplant Advocates, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Malone, Michael)
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Transplant Advocates, LLC, filed by STAR Teams, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Correspondence dated May 13, 2022, and May 19, 2022, #2 Exhibit B - STARs employees and affiliates NDAs, #3 Exhibit C - https://www.transplantadvocates.com/about-us, #4 Exhibit D - Mr. Fletcher's resignation email, #5 Exhibit E - Declarations of Ms. Matsuyama and Dr. Hormuth)(Butcher, Jayme)
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 RESPONSE to Motion re #26 MOTION to Dismiss filed by STAR Teams, Inc.. (Butcher, Jayme)
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER: On June 23, 2022, Defendant Transplant Advocates, LLC filed a motion to dismiss under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6). (Doc. No. #26 .) Any filings made related to the motion to dismiss, including motions for extensions of time or to exceed page limits, shall be decided by Judge Richardson unless referred to the undersigned Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 6/24/2022. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
June 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MOTION to Dismiss by Transplant Advocates, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Malone, Michael)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motion for D. Jack Blum to Appear Pro Hac Vice is granted. Signed by Lynda Hill, Clerk of Court, on 06/22/2022. (lh) Modified on 6/22/2022 (lh).
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order MD State Bar status verified as active for Daniel Jack Blum not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (mg)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MOTION for attorney D. Jack Blum to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3614933) by Transplant Advocates, LLC. (Malone, Michael) Modified on 6/22/2022 (lh).
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER: As contemplated by the Court's Memorandum Opinion and Order denying Plaintiff's request for a temporary restraining order (Doc. No. #22 ), a hearing on Plaintiff's still-pending request for a preliminary injunction is set for July 28, 2022 at 9:00 a.m. Absent extraordinary circumstances, the hearing will conclude on that day. The parties shall file with the Court by 5:00 p.m. on July 25, 2022, the following pertaining to the preliminary injunction hearing: (1) any affidavits; (2) witness lists; (3) exhibit lists; (4) any depositions and/or deposition designations; (5) any stipulations; (6) any motions in limine; and (7) any supplemental briefs. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 6/16/2022. (ln)
June 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion #2 is DENIED IN PART and DEFERRED IN PART. Specifically, the Motion is denied insofar as it requests a TRO and is deferred insofar as it requests a preliminary injunction. A hearing on the Motion's pending request for a Preliminary Injunction will be scheduled in a separate order. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 6/15/2022. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(vh)
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #11 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motion for Jayme L. Butcher to Appear Pro Hac Vice is granted. Signed by Lynda Hill, Clerk of Court, on 06/14/2022. (lh) Modified on 6/14/2022 (lh).
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by STAR Teams, Inc. re #19 Reply to Response to Motion, [CONFORMED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE] (Naylor, Andrew)
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 REPLY to Response to re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction [PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S EMERGENCY MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION] filed by STAR Teams, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Transplant Advocates' About Us Webpage, #2 Attachment Proposed Order)(Naylor, Andrew)
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SUMMONS returned executed by STAR Teams, Inc.. Transplant Advocates, LLC served on 6/7/2022. (Naylor, Andrew)
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order TN State Bar status verified as active for Rachel H. Berg admitted to this court. (mg)
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE TO FILER re DE#19 : Pursuant to Local Rule 5.01, Certificates of Service shall identify by name the person served, what was served, the method of service, and date of service. Counsel did not include all Counsel on the certificate of service. Please FILE a conformed Certificate of Service for this document. (mg)
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel H. Berg on behalf of Transplant Advocates, LLC (Berg, Rachel)
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Transplant Advocates, LLC. (Malone, Michael)
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Transplant Advocates, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1_Declaration of Candy St Marie, #2 Exhibit Ex A_2019 Contract, #3 Exhibit Ex B_Nonemployee Compensation, #4 Exhibit Ex C_Dr Hormuth Agreement, #5 Exhibit Ex D_Webpage)(Malone, Michael)
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Malone on behalf of Transplant Advocates, LLC (Malone, Michael)
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order TN State Bar status verified as active for Michael A. Malone admitted to this court. (mg)
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE TO FILER re DE#13 : The wrong event was used. The correct event should be Service of Process/Summons Returned Executed. Counsel shall re-file the document. (mg)
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Motion for TRO and Proposed TRO served on Candy St. Marie on June 7, 2020, filed by STAR Teams, Inc.. (Naylor, Andrew)
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order PA State Bar status verified as active for Jayme L. Butcher not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (mg)
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE TO FILER re DE#12 : The wrong event was used. The correct event should be Service of Process/Summons Returned Executed. Counsel shall re-file the document. (mg)
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ***DISREGARD*** AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, complaint, Motion for TRO and proposed TRO served on Candy St. Marie on June 7, 2020, filed by STAR Teams, Inc.. (Naylor, Andrew) Modified on 6/9/2022 (mg).
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION for attorney Jayme L. Butcher to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3608321) by STAR Teams, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Naylor, Andrew)
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE by STAR Teams, Inc. {NOTICE OF SERVICE} (Naylor, Andrew)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Pending before the Court is Plaintiff's Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction #2 . Defendant shall file a response to the Motion (or a request for an extension that states Plaintiff's position on such a request) on or before close of business Friday, June 10, 2022. If neither a response nor a request for an extension is filed by close of business Friday, the Court will proceed as appropriate. If Defendant files a response by close of business Friday, Plaintiff may file an optional reply by the close of business Monday, June 13, 2022. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 6/7/2022. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Summons issued as to Transplant Advocates, LLC. (Service packet returned to counsel at intake window.) (kc)
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone is set for 7/28/2022 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (kc)
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (kc)
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (kc)
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Case randomly reassigned to Judge Richardson due to attorney firm recusal/conflict of Chief Judge Crenshaw. (Chief District Judge Crenshaw no longer assigned to case.) (bs)
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order PA State Bar status verified as active for Jayme L. Butcher not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (kc)
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order TN State Bar status verified as active for Andrew S. Naylor admitted to this court. (kc)
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE TO COUNSEL Jayme L. Butcher: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $150.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 6/27/2022. (kc)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by STAR Teams, Inc. (kc)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM in Support of #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by STAR Teams, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Cease and Desist Letter, #2 Exhibit B Non-Disclosure Agreements, #3 Attachment - Declaration of Dr. Preben Brandenhoff, #4 Attachment - Declaration of Dr. David A. Hormuth, #5 Attachment - Declaration of Hiroko Matsuyama)(kc)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by STAR Teams, Inc. (kc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/3/2022: #1 Attachment - Proposed TRO) (kc).
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Transplant Advocates, LLC (Filing fee $402, Receipt number ATNMDC-3606296), filed by STAR Teams, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Cease and Desist Letter, #2 Exhibit B Non-Disclosure Agreements, #3 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(kc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STAR Teams, Inc. v. Transplant Advocates, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STAR Teams, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew S. Naylor
Represented By: Jayme L. Butcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transplant Advocates, LLC
Represented By: Daniel Jack Blum
Represented By: Michael A. Malone
Represented By: Rachel H. Berg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?