Doe v. Lee et al
Plaintiff: John Doe and John Doe 73
Defendant: William Lee and David Rausch
Case Number: 2:2023cv00073
Filed: December 19, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Alistair Newbern
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER: Motion #16 is GRANTED and the Clerk shall administratively close this case subject to reopening if any party so requests. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 01/24/24. (ad)
January 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER: The Court's order at Doc. No. #21 is VACATED. Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed Under Pseudonym and for Protective Order (Doc. No. #11 ) is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall proceed as "John Doe 73." Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 01/22/24. (ad)
January 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Strike and Doc. No. 13 shall be stricken. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 1/12/2024. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)
January 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ***VACATE PER DE #23 *** ORDER granting #11 Motion to Proceed under Pseudonym and for Protective Order and the Defendant shall proceed under the pseudonym "John Doe 73." Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 1/12/2024. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc) Modified on 1/22/2024 (ad).
January 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal and Doc. No. #10 shall be sealed. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 1/12/2024. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)
January 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: Plaintiff has filed a motion for preliminary injunction (Doc. No. #7 ). Based on the record as a whole and for good cause shown, the motion will be GRANTED. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 1/12/2024. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(af)
January 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to #1 Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 1/11/2024. (af)
January 11, 2024 TN State Bar status verified as active for David Lester Wickenheiser admitted to this court. (ad)
January 10, 2024 ***DISREGARD***Set Hearing: Discovery Hearing set for 1/30/2024 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (ad) Modified on 1/11/2024 (ad).
January 10, 2024 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint by William Lee, David Rausch. (Wickenheiser, David)
January 10, 2024 Filing 16 Joint MOTION to Stay Administratively Pending Ruling in Sixth Circuit Appeal by William Lee, David Rausch. (Wickenheiser, David)
January 10, 2024 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by David Lester Wickenheiser on behalf of William Lee, David Rausch (Wickenheiser, David)
January 9, 2024 Filing 14 MOTION to Strike UNOPPOSED by John Doe. (Mothershead, Kyle)
January 9, 2024 Filing 13 ***STRICKEN PER ORDER #22 *** MOTION for Preliminary Injunction UNOPPOSED by John Doe. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Proposed Preliminary Injunction Order)(Mothershead, Kyle) Modified on 1/12/2024 (kc).
January 9, 2024 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support of #11 MOTION PROCEED UNDER PSEUDONYM AND FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by John Doe . (Mothershead, Kyle)
January 9, 2024 Filing 11 MOTION PROCEED UNDER PSEUDONYM AND FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER by John Doe. (Mothershead, Kyle)
January 9, 2024 Filing 10 Sealed Document filed by John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A_TBI SORA Entry, #2 Exhibit B_Doe 73 Declaration)(Mothershead, Kyle)
January 9, 2024 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal by John Doe. (Mothershead, Kyle)
January 9, 2024 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support of #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction UNOPPOSED filed by John Doe . (Mothershead, Kyle)
January 9, 2024 Filing 7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction UNOPPOSED by John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Preliminary Injunction Order)(Mothershead, Kyle)
December 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 12/20/23. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ad)
December 19, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 3/7/2024 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (af)
December 19, 2023 Filing 4 Summons issued as to William Lee, David Rausch. Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail. (af)
December 19, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (af)
December 19, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (af)
December 19, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against William Lee, David Rausch (Filing fee $405, Receipt number ATNMDC-3976478), filed by John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(af)
December 19, 2023 TN State Bar status verified as active for Kyle F. Mothershead admitted to this court. (af)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Lee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Represented By: Kyle F. Mothershead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 73
Represented By: Kyle F. Mothershead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Lee
Represented By: David Lester Wickenheiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Rausch
Represented By: David Lester Wickenheiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?