People First of TN, et al v. Clover Bottom Devel, et al
Case Number: 3:1995cv01227
Filed: December 22, 1995
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Office: Nashville Office
Presiding Judge: Robert Echols
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1206 ORDER: Pending before the Court are two Reports and Recommendations of the Magistrate Judge (Doc. Nos. 1201, 1203), to which no party filed timely objections. The Court has reviewed the Reports and Recommendations and conducted a de novo review of the record. The Reports and Recommendations are ADOPTED. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 8/14/2017. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jw)
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1203 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: Based upon the compliance meeting conducted by this Court on June 30, 2017, this Court FINDS, and hereby recommends, that good cause exist to enter an Order holding that Defendants have complied with Section X.G. of the Exit Plan. Furthermore, pursuant to the Agreed Order and based upon the Court's findings of compliance with all material provisions of Section X of the Exit Plan (in addition to this Report and Recommendation, see Report and Recommenda tion ECF 1141 and ECF 1201), the Court FINDS that the State now has complied with all material provisions of Section X of the Exit Plan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 6/30/2017. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jw)
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1201 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: It is hereby ORDERED that the initial case management conference scheduled for August 21, 2017 at 3:45 p.m. is RESET for Monday, August 28, 2017 at 3:45 p.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 6/27/2017. (xc:Pro se party by email. ) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jw)
January 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1160 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: Accordingly, the Court hereby rules as follows: (1) The R & Rs (Docket Nos. 1141, 1149, & 1158) are hereby ACCEPTED and APPROVED; (2) The Court hereby FINDS that Defendants have complied with the follow ing sections of the Exit Plan: II, III.A, III.B, III.C, IV.E, V.B, VI.B, VII.B, VIII, IX, X.A, and X.B. Signed by Chief Judge Kevin H. Sharp on 1/8/2016. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jw)
December 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1159 ORDER: The R & Rs (Docket Nos. 1155 & 1157 ) are hereby ACCEPTED and APPROVED. The Court hereby FINDS that Defendants have complied with the following sections of the Exit Plan: III.E, III.F, III.G, IV.A, IV.B, IV.C, IV.D, IV.F, V.A, and VI.D. Signed by Chief Judge Kevin H. Sharp on 12/14/15. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
December 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1158 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: Based upon the compliance meeting conducted by this Court on December 9, 2015 and the agreement of all parties, this Court finds, and hereby recommends, that good cause exist to enter an Order holding that Defendants have complied with and completed Section IV.E; Section VI.B; Section VII.B; and, Section IX. Furthermore, pursuant to the Agreed Order and based upon the Court's previous findings of compliance with all of the other material provisions of Sections II-IX of the Exit Plan, (see Report and Recommendations, ECF No. 1141; Report and Recommendations, ECF No. 1145; Report and Recommendations, ECF No. 1147; Report and Recommendations, ECF. No. 1149; Report and Recommendations, ECF No. 1155; and, Report and Recommendations, ECF No. 1157), the Court finds that the State has complied with all material provisions of Sections II-IX of the Exit Plan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 12/11/2015. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jw)
November 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1157 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: Based upon the compliance meeting conducted by this Court on November 3, 2015 and the agreement of all parties, this Court finds, and hereby recommends, that good cause exist to enter an Order holding that Defendants hav e complied with and completed Section III.F; Section IV.C and IV.D; and, Section V.A. Pursuant to paragraph 7 of the Agreed Order, People First, the United States, and the Parent Guardian Associations of Clover Bottom Developmental Center and of Greene Valley Developmental Center have fourteen (14) days from the entry of this Report and Recommendation to file an objection to it. If no such objection is filed within the prescribed period of time, the findings in this Report and Recommendation shall be final and binding on all parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 11/20/15. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
November 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1155 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: Based upon the compliance meeting conducted by this Court on October 7, 2015 and the agreement of all parties, this Court finds, and hereby recommends, that good cause exists to enter an Order holding that Defendants have complied with and completed Section III.E and III.G; Section IV.A, IV.B, and IV.F; and, Section VI.D of the Exit Plan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 11/3/2015. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jw)
July 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1149 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION FOR ENTRY OF AN ORDER FINDING THAT DEFENDANTS HAVE COMPLETED A MATERIAL PROVISION OF THE EXIT PLAN. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 7/14/15. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(af)
April 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1141 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: Based upon the compliance meeting conducted by this Court on March 24, 2015, this Court finds, and hereby recommends, that good cause exist to enter an Order holding that Defendants have complied with Section II, Section III.A., III.B., III.C., Section VIII, and Section X.A. and X.B of the Exit Plan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 4/8/15. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(af)
October 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1093 AGREED ORDER ON JOINT APPLICATION FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEY'S FEES AND REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES TO THE PARENT GUARDIAN ASSOCIATIONS. Signed by District Judge Kevin H. Sharp on 10/30/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
February 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1069 MEMORANDUM. An appropriate Order shall be entered. Signed by District Judge Kevin H. Sharp on 2/6/12. (tmw)
February 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1067 MEMORANDUM. An appropriate Order will be entered. Signed by District Judge Kevin H. Sharp on 2/1/12. (tmw) Modified text on 2/1/2012 (tmw).
June 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 991 ORDER granting 984 Motion for Leave to File Emergent Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement and Enjoin The Planned June 22 Transition of L.S. to GVDC without QRP Review or Approval. The Clerk is hereby directed to file the documents appearing at D E Nos 984-1 through 984-5 under separate docket entry numbers. Due to the time constraints faced by the Court in ruling on the United States' motion, the Court hereby GRANTS a TRO restraining the State from transferring L.S. from Clover Bottom Developmental Center to Greene Valley Developmental Center on June 22, 2010, as planned, and until further Order of the Court after the Court has had the opportunity to consider the filings and positions of the parties. The Court may set a hearing on the United States' motion in a separate Order. It is so ordered. Signed by Senior Judge Robert Echols on 6/21/10. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(af)
May 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 971 ORDER: Pending before the Court is Defendant's "Motion for Leave to File Accompanying Emergency Motion to Compel Quality Review Panel to Comply with Settlement Agreement or, in the Alternative, for Declaratory Relief" (Docket Entry No. 964). The Motion is hereby GRANTED. A Hearing on the Emergency Motion to Compel is hereby scheduled for Thursday, May 13, 2010, at 9:00 a.m. Any response to the Motion must be filed by Wednesday, May 12, 2010, at 4:00 p.m. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Senior Judge Robert Echols on 5/11/10. (af)
April 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 960 ORDER: The parties in this litigation participated an additional settlement conference at their request with the Magistrate Judge. Two cases were discussed and the Magistrate Judge believes that the parties have reached informal agreements that will hopefully resolve these two issues without the necessity of the parties seeking formal Court rulings on the terms of the settlement agreement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 4/1/10. (km)
October 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 912 AGREED ORDER ON JOINT APPLICATION FOR AN AWARD OF ATTORNEYS' FEES AND EXPENSES TO PEOPLE FIRTS: granting 911 Motion for Attorney Fees. Plaintiffs/Intervener People First, et al. are awarded attorneys fees and litigation expenses in the amount of $$88,332.98 to be paid by the State ofTennessee. Signed by Senior Judge Robert Echols on 10/26/09. (dt)
December 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 886 AGREED ORDER re 885 Consent MOTION for Attorney Fees. The Intervenor Parent Guardian Associations (the PGA) and the State of Tennessee have filed a Joint Application For Award of Attorneys Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses to the PGA. The PGA are "prevailing parties" entitled to awards of expenses and reasonable attorney's fees in this case. The parties have agreed that Thirty-Three Thousand One Hundred Fourteen and No/100 Dollars ($33,114.00) for attorney's fees and Sixty and 95/100 Dollars ($60.95) for expenses, which collectively represents an aggregate award of Thirty-Three Thousand One Hundred Seventy-Four and 95/100 Dollars ($33,174.95), represents an appropriate award of attorneys fees and expen ses for monitoring and enforcement related work during the period from December 1, 2007 through November 12, 2008. Accordingly, it is hereby ordered that the Intervenor PGA are awarded attorney's fees and expenses in the aggregate amount of Thi rty-Three Thousand One Hundred Seventy-Four and 95/100 Dollars ($33,174.95). Based on the statements made in the joint application, this award shall be in satisfaction of hours expended and costs incurred in connection with the PGA's monitoring and enforcement work during the period from December 1, 2007 through November 12, 2008. It is so ORDERED. Signed by Senior Judge Robert Echols on 12/23/08. (af)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: People First of TN, et al v. Clover Bottom Devel, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?