Lopez v. Metro
Plaintiff: Gilberto Lopez, by and through the Cumberland Trust & Investment Company as next friend and trustee of The Gilberto Kelly Lopez Irrevocable Trust
Defendant: Genesis Learning Centers
Case Number: 3:2007cv00799
Filed: August 2, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Office: Nashville Office
County: Davidson
Presiding Judge: Juliet E. Griffin
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 588 ORDER: For the reasons set forth in the Memorandum issued contemporaneously herewith, the Court hereby enters the following rulings: (1) Genesis' Motion for Costs 556 is hereby DENIED, but said denial is WITHOUT PREJUDICE to Genesis filing a b ill of costs which complies with Local Rule 54.01 within twenty days of entry of this Order; (2) Genesis' Motion for Attorneys' Fees 559 is hereby DENIED; (3) Plaintiff's Motion for New Trial 573 is hereby DENIED; and (4) Plaintiff's Motion for Oral Argument 574 is hereby DENIED. It is so ORDERED. Signed by Senior Judge Robert Echols on 6/3/10. (tmw)
January 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 498 ORDER granting 487 Motion to Adopt and Incorporate by Reference Motions In Limine (Nos. 308, 310, 312, 320, 322, 328, 336, 341, 343). Signed by Senior Judge Robert Echols on 1/28/2010. (dt)
July 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 460 ORDER: For the reasons set forth in the accompanying Memorandum, the Court hereby enters the following rulings: The Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff-Intervenor United States of America 164 is hereby DENIED. The Motion for Summary Judg ment filed by Defendant Genesis Learning Centers 169 is hereby GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. The Motions for Summary Judgment filed by Metropolitan Government of Nashville and Davidson County 174 and 178 are hereby GRANTED IN PART and DEN IED IN PART. Plaintiff Kimberly Lopez's Motion for Summary Judgment 183 is hereby DENIED. The Motions for Oral Argument on the pending Motions for Summary Judgment 218 and 225 are hereby DENIED. The Motions for Leave to File Excess Pages [ 204] and 246 are hereby GRANTED. The Motions to Strike 257 , 259 and 266 are hereby DENIED. The Motions for Leave to File Reply Memorandums 273 and 276 are hereby GRANTED. The Motion for Review 279 filed by Plaintiff-Intervenor is hereby DENIED. The Motion to Remand to State Court Plaintiff's Claims Under the Tennessee Governmental Tort Liability Act 280 is hereby DENIED. Signed by Senior Judge Robert Echols on 7/7/09. (dt)
January 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER: As provided herein, the motion of deft Metropolitan Government of Nashville and Davidson County, TN, to quash subpoena 145 is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 1/15/09. (tmw)
November 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER granting United States' 109 Motion to Intervene. The Clerk is directed to file and docket the complaint in intervention attached to the motion to intervene. Deft Metro shall have until 11/24/08, to file a response to the complaint in intervention. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 11/4/08. (tmw)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopez v. Metro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gilberto Lopez, by and through the Cumberland Trust & Investment Company as next friend and trustee of The Gilberto Kelly Lopez Irrevocable Trust
Represented By: William Gary Blackburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesis Learning Centers
Represented By: Jay N. Chamness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?