Vashchuk v. Brake et al
Plaintiff: Vladimir A. Vashchuk
Defendant: David Brake and TN Securitas Security Services
Case Number: 3:2009cv00905
Filed: September 29, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Office: Nashville Office
County: Davidson
Presiding Judge: E. Clifton Knowles
Presiding Judge: Aleta A. Trauger
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER: The Report and Recommendation 47 is therefore ACCEPTED and made the findings of fact and conclusions of law of this court. For the reasons expressed therein, it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion to Dismiss For Failure to Prosecute filed by d efendant Securitas Security Services U.S.A., Inc. 37 is GRANTED, and this case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The only other defendant having previously being dismissed from this case, the Clerk is ordered to CLOSE this file. The trial scheduled for 6/21/2011 is CANCELLED. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 4/18/11. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(dt) Modified Text on 4/19/2011 (dt).
March 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 47 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that 37 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution filed by Securitas Security Services U.S.A., Inc. be GRANTED, and that this action be DISMISSED. Any party has 14 days after service of this Report and Recommendation in which to file any written objections to this Recommendation with the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 03/22/2011. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(ab)
July 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER: Bench Trial set for 6/21/2011 at 09:00 AM before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. The Magistrate Judge shall conduct the pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order. He shall assist the plaintiff with the preparation of subpoenas, discuss e xhibits, instructions and all other matters necessary for having the case prepared to be tried on the date set. The Magistrate Judge has been managing this case. If he considers it appropriate to appoint counsel to represent the plaintiff at trial, he should do so. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 7/6/10. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(dt)
July 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 SCHEDULING ORDER: Motion to Amend Pleadings due by 8/30/2010. Discovery due by 12/30/2010. Dispositive Motions due by 1/31/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 7/2/10. (dt)
June 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER: The Magistrate Judge's 25 Report and Recommendation is ACCEPTED and made the findings of fact and conclusions of law of this court. It is hereby ORDERED that deft's 9 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED, and deft Brake is DISMISSED from this action with prejudice. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 6/24/10. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(rd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vashchuk v. Brake et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vladimir A. Vashchuk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Brake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TN Securitas Security Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?