Jordan v. United States of America et al

Plaintiff: Brucestan T. Jordan
Defendant: United States of America, Kenny Atkinson, U.S. Department of Justice and Eric Holder
Case Number: 3:2010cv00525
Filed: May 28, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Office: Nashville Office
Presiding Judge: Aleta A. Trauger
Nature of Suit: Mandamus and Other
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER: United States' Motion to Dismiss 61 is GRANTED and this action is Dismissed with prejudice. The Court declines to issue a Certificate of Appealability. This is the Final Order in this action. Signed by District Judge William J. Haynes, Jr on 9/8/11. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(dt)
April 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER: The Clerk has received a filing dated 10/22/2010, which plaintiff seeks to have filed under seal. This filing bears the heading "This Is Not A Pleading." After reading petitioners filing more than once, the undersigned Magistrate Jud ge has been unable to discern its meaning, if it has one, and has concluded, therefore, that it amounts to pure nonsense. In any event, petitioner has stated no legal ground to justify this document being filed under seal. Therefore, the Clerk is directed to make this filing a part of the record in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge John S. Bryant on 4/1/11. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(dt)
November 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting 39 Motion to Strike 38 JUDICIAL NOTICE IN ACCORDANCE WITH FED. RULE OF EVIDENCE, RULE 201. All pro se documents filed after the appointment are Stricken. Plaintiff is advised that with the appointed counsel, pro se papers are not to be accepted by the Court. Signed by District Judge William J. Haynes, Jr on 11/24/10. (dt)
October 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER: Upon review of the record, the Motion to Stay 27 and Motion to Dismiss 26 are Denied without prejudice to renew. The Federal Public Defender is appointed to represent the movant and is given 30 days to file an amended motion to vacate, if necessary. Signed by District Judge William J. Haynes, Jr on 10/20/10. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(dt)
October 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER: The Clerk is ORDERED to serve the respondent with a copy of the motion. The respondent shall file a response to this motion within sixty (60) days from entry of this Order. Signed by District Judge William J. Haynes, Jr on 10/14/10. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(dt)
July 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Chief Judge Todd J. Campbell recused. Case reassigned to District Judge William J. Haynes, Jr for all further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Todd J. Campbell on 7/20/10. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(dt)
June 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: The movant shall, within 30 days of the date of entry of this order, show cause why his motion should not be dismissed as time barred. The petitioner is forewarned that failure to comply with this order will result in his petition being dismissed as untimely. Signed by Chief Judge Todd J. Campbell on 6/29/2010. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(dt)
May 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations 4 and Transferring Case to District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee. Signed by Judge Joan A. Lenard on 5/27/2010. (dpv) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 5/28/2010.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jordan v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brucestan T. Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Jimmie Lynn Ramsaur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenny Atkinson
Represented By: Jimmie Lynn Ramsaur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Justice
Represented By: Jimmie Lynn Ramsaur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Holder
Represented By: Jimmie Lynn Ramsaur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?