Johnson et al v. Metropolitan Government of Nashville and Davidson County et al
Plaintiff: Quiana Johnson, Karissa Sweat and Waynnesia Brooks
Defendant: Metropolitan Government of Nashville and Davidson County, Joe Shelton and John Doe Police Officers 1-20
Case Number: 3:2010cv00589
Filed: June 15, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Office: Nashville Office
County: Davidson
Presiding Judge: Todd J. Campbell
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER: For the reasons set forth in the accompanying Memorandum, the Court hereby rules as follows: Defendant Joe Shelton's Motion for Summary Judgment 69 is DENIED, and his Motion to Ascertain Status 89 is DENIED AS MOOT; and Plaintiff Clarisse Sweats Motions to Strike 82 & 83 are DENIED. The Court will hold a final pretrial conference in this case on 7/23/2012 at 3:30 p.m., as previously scheduled. Signed by District Judge Kevin H. Sharp on 7/10/12. (dt)
June 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER: Jury Trial set for 8/14/2012 at 9:00 AM before District Judge Kevin H. Sharp. Pretrial Conference set for 7/23/2012 at 3:30 PM before District Judge Kevin H. Sharp. Exhibit List and Witness List due by 7/18/2012. Joint Proposed Pretrial Order due by 7/18/2012. (SEE ORDER FOR OTHER DEADLINES) Signed by District Judge Kevin H. Sharp on 6/22/12. (dt)
September 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER: For the reasons explained in the accompanying Memorandum, the Court rules as follows: (1) The Metropolitan Government's Motion To Dismiss Second Amended Complaint 34 is hereby GRANTED; (2) Defendant Joe Shelton's Motion To Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint (R.33) For Failure To State A Claim 38 is hereby GRANTED; (3) Quiana Johnson, as parent and next friend of Reginald Dewayne Wallace II, a minor, Waynnesia Brooks, and William Wallace are hereby DISMISSED as plaintiffs from the § 1983 claims (Counts 1 through 3) for lack of standing; (4) Plaintiff Karissa Sweat's § 1983 claims for municipal liability against the Metropolitan Government of Nashville and Davidson County (Count 3) are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE for failure to state a claim; and (5) All state-law tort claims (Counts 4 through 8) are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for lack of jurisdiction. (6) The only claims remaining for litigation are Plaintiff Sweat's &# 167; 1983 claims brought against Officer Shelton and the John Doe police officers in their individual capacities for the alleged violation of Reginald Wallace's Fourth Amendment rights (Counts 1 and 2). (7) This case is returned to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management under Local Rule 16.01 and the Court's Order of Referral entered on June 15, 2010 3 . IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Chief Judge Todd J. Campbell on 9/13/10. (tmw)
July 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER re 16 Motion for Leave to File Amendment to Complaint. For the foregoing reasons, the instant Motion 16 is DENIED AS MOOT. The Clerk, however, is directed to file Plaintiffs' Proposed Amended Complaint 16 -1. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 7/19/10. (tmw)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson et al v. Metropolitan Government of Nashville and Davidson County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quiana Johnson
Represented By: Michael B. Schwegler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karissa Sweat
Represented By: Michael B. Schwegler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Waynnesia Brooks
Represented By: Michael B. Schwegler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Government of Nashville and Davidson County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Shelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Police Officers 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?