June 12, 2014 |
Filing
182
ORDER: Pending before the Court is Plaintiff's Motion for Rule 41 Voluntary Dismissal 178 and 180 . Defendants do not oppose the voluntary dismissal without prejudice 181 . Accordingly, this action is DISMISSED without prejudice, and the Clerk is directed to close the file. Any pending Motions are denied as moot. This Order shall constitute the final judgment in this case pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 58. The pretrial conference set for July 25, 2014, and the jury trial set for July 29, 2014, are canceled. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 6/12/14. (dt)
|
May 6, 2014 |
Filing
176
ORDER granting 175 Motion for Additional Time to Obtain Counsel. Plaintiff shall have until June 6, 2014, to obtain new counsel. In addition, Plaintiff shall file a Notice of Change of Address with the Court if the address on the current docket sheet is incorrect. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 5/6/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
|
January 27, 2014 |
Filing
169
ORDER granting re 164 MOTION to Continue Trial. Exhibit List due by 5/8/2014. Witness List due by 5/8/2014. Joint Proposed Pretrial Order due by 5/8/2014. Jury Trial set for 6/10/2014 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 874 before District Judge To dd J. Campbell. Pretrial Conference set for 5/15/2014 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 874 before District Judge Todd J. Campbell. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 1/27/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(la)
|
September 23, 2013 |
Filing
163
ORDER granting 161 MOTION to Continue Trial Date. Jury Trial reset for 3/4/2014 at 9:00 AM before District Judge Todd J. Campbell. Pretrial Conference reset for 2/24/2014 at 10:30 AM before District Judge Todd J. Campbell. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 9/23/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
|
July 26, 2013 |
Filing
119
ORDER: Jury Trial set for 10/1/2013 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 874 before District Judge Todd J. Campbell. Pretrial Conference set for 9/13/2013 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 874 before District Judge Todd J. Campbell. Exhibit List due by 9/6/2013. Witness List due by 9/6/2013. Joint Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/6/2013. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 7/26/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(la)
|
December 21, 2012 |
Filing
116
ORDER: MOTION to Reset Trial Date 113 is Granted. Jury Trial set for 10/1/2013 at 9:00 AM before District Judge Todd J. Campbell. Pretrial Conference set for 9/23/2013 at 2:00 PM before District Judge Todd J. Campbell. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/16/2013. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 12/21/12. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
|
December 20, 2012 |
Filing
109
ORDER: Joint MOTION to Continue Trial 106 is Granted. Jury Trial set for 8/13/2013 at 9:00 AM before District Judge Todd J. Campbell. Pretrial Conference set for 8/5/2013 at 9:00 AM before District Judge Todd J. Campbell. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 7/29/2013. Exhibit List and Witness List due by 7/29/2013. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 12/20/12. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
|
October 24, 2012 |
Filing
97
ORDER: For the reasons stated in the accompanying Memorandum, the Motion for Summary Judgment 79 filed by Defendant NDG Properties, Inc. is denied. The Motion for Summary Judgment 84 filed by Defendants T.R. Franklin, Inc. d/b/a Tin Roof 2, Sheer , McPhee and Romine is granted in part and denied in part. Plaintiff's claim for negligent hiring and retention against the Tin Roof Defendants and Plaintiffs claim against the individual Defendants are DISMISSED. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 10/24/12. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
|
September 25, 2012 |
Filing
87
ORDER: There are pending motions for summary judgment filed by the defendants in this case and it is set before the Honorable Judge Todd Campbell for a Final Pretrial Conference on January 14, 2013 at 9:00 a.m. with a Jury Trial set for January 22, 2 013 at 9:00 a.m. Inasmuch as there appear to be no further proceedings to be conducted before the Magistrate Judge, the Clerk is directed to term the referral and forward the file to Judge Campbell. Judge Magistrate Judge Joe Brown no longer assigned to case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 9/25/12. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
|
September 10, 2012 |
Filing
78
ORDER: Motions to Dismiss 76 and 77 are Granted. Plaintiff's claims under Count VI of the Complaint are DISMISSED without prejudice, and Plaintiff's claims against Defendants SMW Carothers, LLC and NDG Carothers, LLC are DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 9/10/12. (dt)
|
June 22, 2012 |
Filing
75
ORDER: Joint Motion of Plaintiff and Defendants Joshua Edwards and Ian Herrin for Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice of Defendants Edwards and Herrin 74 is Granted. Plaintiff's claims against Defendants Edwards and Herrin are DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Todd J. Campbell on 6/22/12. (dt)
|
May 21, 2012 |
Filing
73
ORDER granting 72 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Larsen MacColl Partners, L.P. Without Prejudice. Larsen McColl Partners, L.P. terminated. Signed by Chief Judge Todd J. Campbell on 5/21/12. (dt)
|
February 24, 2012 |
Filing
70
ORDER: A telephone conference was held with the parties on 2/23/2012. The parties advised that they had successfully completed their depositions in Jackson and were generally on schedule with the revised schedule orders that were entered in the case. At the present time they did not see the need for any action by the Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 2/23/12. (dt)
|
February 8, 2012 |
Filing
69
ORDER: Telephone Conference held on 2/8/2012 regarding deposition issues. It appears that the parties are in the process of working the matter out so that the deposition can continue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 2/8/12. (dt)
|
February 3, 2012 |
Filing
62
ORDER: Settlement Conference held on 2/2/2012. The parties and their respective representatives met, negotiated in good faith, but did not agree to a settlement of this case. The Clerk is directed to return this file to Magistrate Judge Brown. Judge Magistrate Judge John S. Bryant no longer assigned to case. Signed by Magistrate Judge John S. Bryant on 2/3/12. (dt)
|