HCA-Information Technology & Services, Inc. v. Informatica Corporation
Plaintiff: |
HCA-Information Technology & Services, Inc. |
Defendant: |
Informatica Corporation |
Case Number: |
3:2010cv01155 |
Filed: |
December 9, 2010 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee |
Office: |
Nashville Office |
County: |
Davidson |
Presiding Judge: |
E. Clifton Knowles |
Presiding Judge: |
John T. Nixon |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Contract |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
January 26, 2012 |
Filing
113
ORDER: Pending before the Court are Defendants Motion for Relief from the Initial Case Management Order and Defendants Motion for Expedited Consideration of that same Motion. Docket Entry Nos. 109 and 111 . These Motions are granted, and with perm ission of Judge Nixon, the trial date is continued. The following deadlines are extended as follows: Discovery due by 5/23/2012. Dispositive Motions due by 6/23/2012. Jury Trial reset for 11/6/2012 at 9:00 AM before Senior Judge John T. Nixon. Pretrial Conference reset for 10/26/2012 at 10:00 AM before Senior Judge John T. Nixon. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 1/26/12. (dt)
|
January 18, 2012 |
Filing
107
ORDER granting 106 Motion for Leave to File a Reply Brief. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 1/18/12. (dt)
|
January 4, 2012 |
Filing
101
ORDER granting 92 Motion for Oral Argument on 43 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Court Schedules a hearing for 2/13/2012 at 10:00 a.m. Also, the Motion for Leave to File a Surreply 97 is Granted. Defendant may file a surreply brief no later than one week prior to the scheduled hearing. Signed by Senior Judge John T. Nixon on 1/4/12. (dt)
|
October 25, 2011 |
Filing
61
ORDER: Deft's 51 Motion to Deny or Continue Consideration of Pltf's Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED in part to the extent that deft may conduct the specified depositions and other discovery that it reasonably believes will lead to information on the timing of pltfs initial use of multiple repositories. The Court finds that defts requested extension is likely to beunnecessarily long. Deft is granted 30 days from entry of this Order to respond to pltfs 43 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Senior Judge John T. Nixon on 10/25/11. (rd)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?