1st Source Bank v. Wilson Bank & Trust et al
Plaintiff: 1st Source Bank
Defendant: J.E.A. Leasing, LLC, Pinnacle Financial Partners, Inc., FPC Funding II, LLC, Wilson Bank & Trust, K&K Trucking, Inc., Transcapital & Leasing, Inc., First Continental Leasing, Inc., Geologic Solutions, Inc. and Community Bank of Smith County
Case Number: 3:2011cv00410
Filed: May 2, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Office: Nashville Office
County: Wilson
Presiding Judge: Todd J. Campbell
Presiding Judge: Juliet E. Griffin
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER granting 141 Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b). In light of the Court's prior Orders (Docket Nos. 129 , 137 , 140 ), all matters now having been resolved, this Order shall constitute the final judgment in this case pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 58. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 1/18/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
October 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 128 MEMORANDUM OPINION OF THE COURT. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 10/3/2012. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(eh)
August 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER: Bench Trial set for 9/18/2012 at 9:00 AM before Chief Judge Todd J. Campbell. Pretrial Conference set for 9/10/2012 at 10:30 AM before Chief Judge Todd J. Campbell. Exhibit List, Witness List and Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/4/2012. Signed by Chief Judge Todd J. Campbell on 8/23/11. (dt)
August 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ENTRY OF DEFAULT: The Clerk hereby enters default against Defendants FPC Funding II, LLC, J.E.A. Leasing, LLC, and K&K Trucking, Inc. pursuant to FRCP 55(a). Signed by Clerk of Court Keith Throckmorton on 8/22/11. (dt)
August 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER: Plaintiff's motion for default judgment against defendant Geologic Solutions, Inc. 43 is rendered MOOT, and the Clerk is directed to terminate that motion as pending. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 8/19/11. (dt)
July 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER: Plaintiff has filed a Notice of Dismissal without prejudice 36 as to one of the Defendants herein, Pinnacle Financial Partners, Inc. Accordingly, Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Pinnacle Financial Partners, Inc. are DISMISSED without prejudice. Pinnacle Financial Partners, Inc. terminated. Signed by Chief Judge Todd J. Campbell on 7/22/11. (dt)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 1st Source Bank v. Wilson Bank & Trust et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.E.A. Leasing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pinnacle Financial Partners, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FPC Funding II, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilson Bank & Trust
Represented By: David B. Foutch
Represented By: Tom P. Thompson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K&K Trucking, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transcapital & Leasing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Continental Leasing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geologic Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Community Bank of Smith County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 1st Source Bank
Represented By: Christopher D. Markel
Represented By: Adam S. Major
Represented By: Wilson C. Von Kessler, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?