USA v. Meridian Surgical Partners, LLC
Plaintiff: United States of America and Thomas Reed Simmons
Defendant: Meridian Surgical Partners, LLC, Meridian Surgical Partners-Florida II, LLC, MS Holding Co., Inc., Treasure Coast Surgery Center, LLC, Treasure Coast Surgery, Inc., William Byron, Anesthesia Advantage, Inc. and John Doe ASCs A through Z
Case Number: 3:2011cv00439
Filed: May 10, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Office: Nashville Office
County: Davidson
Presiding Judge: Todd J. Campbell
Presiding Judge: E. Clifton Knowles
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER: Motion for a Stay of Deadlines and Ruling on Pending Motions to Permit the Parties to Finalize Settlement 150 is GRANTED. The parties shall promptly notify the Court when they have finalized a settlement but, in any event, shall file a report on the status of the case by July 15, 2014. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 6/6/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
May 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER: Pending before the Court are Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Expert Report and Testimony of Kathleen McNamara 115 and Relator's Motion for Oral Argument and Hearing 143 . For the reasons stated in the accompanying Memorandum, Defendants' Motion to Exclude is DENIED, and Relator's Motion for Oral Argument and Hearing is moot. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 5/27/14. (dt)
May 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER granting 144 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Defendants may file their Reply by May 20, 2014. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 5/13/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
October 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER finding as moot 95 Motion to Stay. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 10/18/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(la)
September 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER: Pending before the Court is Plaintiff-Relator's Motion to Adjourn Pending Deadlines and Continue the Trial Date (Docket No. 84 ). Plaintiff-Relator actually seeks to extend, not adjourn, the pending deadlines. Whether the trial is con tinued depends upon the Magistrate Judge's ruling on extending the other pending deadlines. Therefore, this Motion is referred to the Magistrate Judge, who shall consider it and Defendant's Response (Docket No. 87 ) and make any needed a djustments in the pending deadlines. The jury trial of this action remains set for May 6, 2014, and the pretrial conference remains set for April 28, 2014, unless and until the Magistrate Judge recommends that they be continued. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 9/19/13. (la)
June 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 77 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Motion to Amend Pleadings due by 8/12/2013. Discovery due by 10/18/2013. Dispositive Motions due by 12/6/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 6/5/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
May 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER: Motion to Reschedule Trial 72 is Denied as premature. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 5/23/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
May 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER: Pending before the Court is Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint 50 . For the reasons stated in the accompanying Memorandum, Defendants' Motion is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Plaintiff's claims against all Defendants except Meridian Surgical Partners, LLC, Meridian Surgical Partners - Florida II, LLC, MS Holding Co., Inc. and Treasure Coast Surgery Center, LLC are DISMISSED. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 5/2/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
April 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER: Jury Trial set for 5/6/2014 at 9:00 AM before District Judge Todd J. Campbell. Pretrial Conference set for 4/28/2014 at 1:00 PM before District Judge Todd J. Campbell. Exhibit List and Witness List due by 4/21/2014. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4/21/2014. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 4/23/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
March 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting 61 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Matthew M. Curley terminated. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 11cv439. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
March 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting 53 Joint MOTION to Modify Briefing Schedule 46 . Relator's Opposition to Defendants Motion to Dismiss shall be due 3/18/2013 and Defendants' Reply shall be due 4/8/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 3/5/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
February 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 52 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 2/19/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
February 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE: Defendants shall file their motion to dismiss the Amended Complaint on or before 2/13/2013, Relator's opposition shall be due 21 days after the service of Defendants' motion, and Defendants' reply shall be due 14 days after the service of Relator's opposition. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 2/8/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
January 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference is reset for 2/19/2013 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles. Prior to the hearing, counsel for the parties are directed to confer on a Proposed Case Management Order for the progression of this case, which shall be submitted 3 days prior to the Case Management Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 1/15/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
January 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER: Joint MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference 38 is Granted. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 2/25/2013 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 1/8/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
September 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Order: The United States having declined to intervene in this action pursuant to the False Claims Act, 31 U.S.C. § 3730(b)(4)(B), the Court rules as follows: The Complaint shall be unsealed and served upon Defendants by the Relator. All other co ntents of the Court's file in this action shall remain under seal and not be made public or served upon Defendant, except for this Order and the United States' Notice of Election to Decline Intervention, which Relator will serve upon Defendant only after service of the Complaint. The seal shall be lifted as to all other matters occurring in this action after the date of this Order. (SEE ORDER FOR OTHER DETAILS). Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 9/4/12. (dt)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Meridian Surgical Partners, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meridian Surgical Partners, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meridian Surgical Partners-Florida II, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MS Holding Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Treasure Coast Surgery Center, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Treasure Coast Surgery, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Byron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anesthesia Advantage, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe ASCs A through Z
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: John-David H. Thomas
Represented By: Christopher C. Sabis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Reed Simmons
Represented By: William Michael Hamilton
Represented By: Jonathan Kroner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?