USA v. Community Health Systems, Inc.
Plaintiff: United States of America, James Doghramji, Sheree Cook and Rachel Bryant
Defendant: Community Health Systems, Inc., Community Health Systems Professional Services, CHHS Hospital Company, LLC, Dyersburg Hospital Corporation, Shelbyville Hospital Corporation, Brownsville Hospital Corporation, Galesburg Hospital Corporation, Marion Hospital Corporation, Berwick Hospital Corporation, LLC, McNairy Hospital Corporation, Vicksburg Healthcare, LLC, Clinton Hospital Corporation, Hospital of Louisa, Inc., National Healthcare of Mt. Vernon, Inc., Lake Wales Hospital Corporation, Hospital of Morristown, Inc., Southcrest, LLC, Ruston Louisiana Hospital Company, LLC, Jackson, Tennessee Hospital Company, LLC, Foley Hospital Corporation, Pottstown Hospital Company, LLC, Coatesville Hospital Corporation, Waukegan Illinois Hospital, LLC, National Healthcare Leesville, Inc., Greenville Hospital Corporation, Martin Hospital Corporation, Salem Hospital Corporation, Granite City Illinois Hospital Comapny, LLC, Warsaw Health System LLC, Northwest Arkansas Hospitals, LLC, Fallbrook Hospital Corporation, Emporia Hospital Corporation, National Healthcare of Newport, Inc., McKensie Tennessee Hospital Company, LLC, Sunbury Hospital Company, LLC, Williamston Hospital Corporation, Northampton Hospital Company, LLC, Lancaster Hospital Corporation, Lexington Hospital Corporation, Hospital of Fulton, Inc., Crestview Hospital Corporation, Phoenixville Hospital Company, LLC, Jackson Hospital Corporation, Navarro Hospital, LP, Triad of Alabama, LLC, Piney Woods Healthcare System, LP, Brownwood Hospital, LP, West Grove Hospital Company, LLC, Chesterfield/Marlboro, LP, Fort Payne Hospital Corporation, Bullhead City Hospital Corporation, Phillips Hospital Corporation, Augusta Hospital, LLC, Blue Ridge Georgia Hospital Company, LLC, Porter Hospital, LLC, Bluffton Health System, LLC, Wesley Health System, LLC, San Miguel Hospital Corporation, Roswell Hospital Corporation, Carlsbad Medical Center, LLC, Woodward Health System, LLC, Claremore Regional Hospital, LLC, Mary Black Health System, LLC, QHG of South Carolina, Inc., Clarksville Health System, G.P., Cleveland Tennessee Hospital Company, LLC, Laredo Texas Hospital Company, L.P., NHCI of Hillsboro, Inc., Weatherford Texas Hospital Company, LLC, Cleveland Regional Medical Center, L.P., San Angelo Hospital, L.P., Big Spring Hospital Corporation, Longview Medical Center, L.P., Petersburg Hospital Company, LLC, Franklin Hospital Corporation and Cedar Park Health System, L.P.
Case Number: 3:2011cv00442
Filed: May 10, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Office: Nashville Office
County: Williamson
Presiding Judge: Juliet E. Griffin
Presiding Judge: Kevin H. Sharp
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 31:3729 False Claims Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 323 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: Relators' claims for attorneys' fees are barred by 31 U.S.C. § 3730(b)(5), since none of the remaining Relators was first-to- file within the meaning of the False Claims Act on the relevant claims. The D oghramji relators' claims are also barred by 31 U.S.C. § 3730(e)(4), because the allegations contained with the complaint were already publicly disclosed at the time the Doghramji complaint was filed. Therefore, Relators' claims for attorneys' fees are denied and this matter is terminated. Signed by Judge Marvin E. Aspen on 4/1/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 303 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re 286 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: For the foregoing reasons, we sustain CHS's objections to the Report and Recommendation and hold that the Settlement Agreement does not bar CHS from challenging Relators' el igibility for attorneys' fees.Having so held, we must determine next steps. This opinion resolves only one of three issues identified by the parties upon remand. (See Dkt. No. 256 at 13.) We must now determine whether, in the face of CHS's challenges, Relators are entitled to attorneys' fees and expenses under the False Claims Act, and if so, what those fees are. The parties have previously specified that some Relators have briefed some of these issues. (Id. at 1415.) The parties are hereby directed to file a joint status report on or by November 15, 2019 that (1) outlines the remaining issues before this Court, (2) directs us to those briefs already submitted that consider the matter, and/or (3) proposes additional briefing as appropriate. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Marvin E. Aspen on 10/2/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 286 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: For all of the reasons discussed above, the undersigned Magistrate Judge respectfully recommends a determination on remand that the meaning of Term 8 is that urged by Relators, namely that the last sentence restricts any challenges by CHS to the Relators' attorneys' fees to reasonableness objections contained in 31 U.S.C. § 3730(d). ANY OBJECTIONS to this Report and Recommendation must be filed within fourteen (14) days of service of this Report an d Recommendation and must state with particularity the specific portions of this Report and Recommendation to which objection is made. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 8/30/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment - Appendix A)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
August 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 184 MEMORANDUM OPINION OF THE COURT. Signed by Chief Judge Kevin H. Sharp on 8/6/15. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(afs)
October 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 104 REVISED ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Chief Judge Kevin H. Sharp on 10/6/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Community Health Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: John-David H. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Doghramji
Represented By: Traci L. Buschner
Represented By: David W. Garrison
Represented By: Reuben Guttman
Represented By: Kit Pierson
Represented By: Scott P. Tift
Represented By: David Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheree Cook
Represented By: Traci L. Buschner
Represented By: David W. Garrison
Represented By: Reuben Guttman
Represented By: Kit Pierson
Represented By: Scott P. Tift
Represented By: David Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Bryant
Represented By: Traci L. Buschner
Represented By: David W. Garrison
Represented By: Reuben Guttman
Represented By: Kit Pierson
Represented By: Scott P. Tift
Represented By: David Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Community Health Systems, Inc.
Represented By: John R. Jacobson
Represented By: William M. Outhier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Community Health Systems Professional Services
Represented By: John R. Jacobson
Represented By: William M. Outhier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHHS Hospital Company, LLC
Represented By: John R. Jacobson
Represented By: William M. Outhier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dyersburg Hospital Corporation
Represented By: John R. Jacobson
Represented By: William M. Outhier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelbyville Hospital Corporation
Represented By: John R. Jacobson
Represented By: William M. Outhier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brownsville Hospital Corporation
Represented By: John R. Jacobson
Represented By: William M. Outhier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Galesburg Hospital Corporation
Represented By: John R. Jacobson
Represented By: William M. Outhier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marion Hospital Corporation
Represented By: John R. Jacobson
Represented By: William M. Outhier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berwick Hospital Corporation, LLC
Represented By: John R. Jacobson
Represented By: William M. Outhier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McNairy Hospital Corporation
Represented By: John R. Jacobson
Represented By: William M. Outhier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vicksburg Healthcare, LLC
Represented By: John R. Jacobson
Represented By: William M. Outhier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clinton Hospital Corporation
Represented By: John R. Jacobson
Represented By: William M. Outhier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hospital of Louisa, Inc.
Represented By: John R. Jacobson
Represented By: William M. Outhier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Healthcare of Mt. Vernon, Inc.
Represented By: John R. Jacobson
Represented By: William M. Outhier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lake Wales Hospital Corporation
Represented By: John R. Jacobson
Represented By: William M. Outhier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hospital of Morristown, Inc.
Represented By: John R. Jacobson
Represented By: William M. Outhier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southcrest, LLC
Represented By: John R. Jacobson
Represented By: William M. Outhier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruston Louisiana Hospital Company, LLC
Represented By: John R. Jacobson
Represented By: William M. Outhier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackson, Tennessee Hospital Company, LLC
Represented By: John R. Jacobson
Represented By: William M. Outhier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foley Hospital Corporation
Represented By: John R. Jacobson
Represented By: William M. Outhier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pottstown Hospital Company, LLC
Represented By: John R. Jacobson
Represented By: William M. Outhier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coatesville Hospital Corporation
Represented By: John R. Jacobson
Represented By: William M. Outhier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waukegan Illinois Hospital, LLC
Represented By: John R. Jacobson
Represented By: William M. Outhier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Healthcare Leesville, Inc.
Represented By: John R. Jacobson
Represented By: William M. Outhier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greenville Hospital Corporation
Represented By: John R. Jacobson
Represented By: William M. Outhier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Hospital Corporation
Represented By: John R. Jacobson
Represented By: William M. Outhier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salem Hospital Corporation
Represented By: John R. Jacobson
Represented By: William M. Outhier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Granite City Illinois Hospital Comapny, LLC
Represented By: John R. Jacobson
Represented By: William M. Outhier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warsaw Health System LLC
Represented By: John R. Jacobson
Represented By: William M. Outhier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northwest Arkansas Hospitals, LLC
Represented By: John R. Jacobson
Represented By: William M. Outhier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fallbrook Hospital Corporation
Represented By: John R. Jacobson
Represented By: William M. Outhier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emporia Hospital Corporation
Represented By: John R. Jacobson
Represented By: William M. Outhier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Healthcare of Newport, Inc.
Represented By: John R. Jacobson
Represented By: William M. Outhier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKensie Tennessee Hospital Company, LLC
Represented By: John R. Jacobson
Represented By: William M. Outhier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunbury Hospital Company, LLC
Represented By: John R. Jacobson
Represented By: William M. Outhier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Williamston Hospital Corporation
Represented By: John R. Jacobson
Represented By: William M. Outhier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northampton Hospital Company, LLC
Represented By: John R. Jacobson
Represented By: William M. Outhier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lancaster Hospital Corporation
Represented By: John R. Jacobson
Represented By: William M. Outhier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lexington Hospital Corporation
Represented By: John R. Jacobson
Represented By: William M. Outhier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hospital of Fulton, Inc.
Represented By: John R. Jacobson
Represented By: William M. Outhier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crestview Hospital Corporation
Represented By: John R. Jacobson
Represented By: William M. Outhier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phoenixville Hospital Company, LLC
Represented By: John R. Jacobson
Represented By: William M. Outhier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackson Hospital Corporation
Represented By: John R. Jacobson
Represented By: William M. Outhier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navarro Hospital, LP
Represented By: John R. Jacobson
Represented By: William M. Outhier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Triad of Alabama, LLC
Represented By: John R. Jacobson
Represented By: William M. Outhier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Piney Woods Healthcare System, LP
Represented By: John R. Jacobson
Represented By: William M. Outhier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brownwood Hospital, LP
Represented By: John R. Jacobson
Represented By: William M. Outhier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Grove Hospital Company, LLC
Represented By: John R. Jacobson
Represented By: William M. Outhier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chesterfield/Marlboro, LP
Represented By: John R. Jacobson
Represented By: William M. Outhier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fort Payne Hospital Corporation
Represented By: John R. Jacobson
Represented By: William M. Outhier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bullhead City Hospital Corporation
Represented By: John R. Jacobson
Represented By: William M. Outhier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillips Hospital Corporation
Represented By: John R. Jacobson
Represented By: William M. Outhier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Augusta Hospital, LLC
Represented By: John R. Jacobson
Represented By: William M. Outhier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Ridge Georgia Hospital Company, LLC
Represented By: John R. Jacobson
Represented By: William M. Outhier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Porter Hospital, LLC
Represented By: John R. Jacobson
Represented By: William M. Outhier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bluffton Health System, LLC
Represented By: John R. Jacobson
Represented By: William M. Outhier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wesley Health System, LLC
Represented By: John R. Jacobson
Represented By: William M. Outhier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Miguel Hospital Corporation
Represented By: John R. Jacobson
Represented By: William M. Outhier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roswell Hospital Corporation
Represented By: John R. Jacobson
Represented By: William M. Outhier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlsbad Medical Center, LLC
Represented By: John R. Jacobson
Represented By: William M. Outhier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Woodward Health System, LLC
Represented By: John R. Jacobson
Represented By: William M. Outhier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Claremore Regional Hospital, LLC
Represented By: John R. Jacobson
Represented By: William M. Outhier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Black Health System, LLC
Represented By: John R. Jacobson
Represented By: William M. Outhier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QHG of South Carolina, Inc.
Represented By: John R. Jacobson
Represented By: William M. Outhier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clarksville Health System, G.P.
Represented By: John R. Jacobson
Represented By: William M. Outhier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleveland Tennessee Hospital Company, LLC
Represented By: John R. Jacobson
Represented By: William M. Outhier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laredo Texas Hospital Company, L.P.
Represented By: John R. Jacobson
Represented By: William M. Outhier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NHCI of Hillsboro, Inc.
Represented By: John R. Jacobson
Represented By: William M. Outhier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weatherford Texas Hospital Company, LLC
Represented By: John R. Jacobson
Represented By: William M. Outhier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleveland Regional Medical Center, L.P.
Represented By: John R. Jacobson
Represented By: William M. Outhier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Angelo Hospital, L.P.
Represented By: John R. Jacobson
Represented By: William M. Outhier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Big Spring Hospital Corporation
Represented By: John R. Jacobson
Represented By: William M. Outhier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Longview Medical Center, L.P.
Represented By: John R. Jacobson
Represented By: William M. Outhier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Petersburg Hospital Company, LLC
Represented By: John R. Jacobson
Represented By: William M. Outhier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Franklin Hospital Corporation
Represented By: John R. Jacobson
Represented By: William M. Outhier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cedar Park Health System, L.P.
Represented By: John R. Jacobson
Represented By: William M. Outhier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?